Cook v. USA
Petitioner: Sandra Cook
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00369
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROVISIONAL SEALING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. It is ordered that: (1) that the United States Response to Movant Cooks Motion for Release on Bond (CV Doc. 6; CR Doc. 169) is SEALED pending further order of the Court;(2) the Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Movant Sandra Cook a copy of the Ex Parte Motion to Seal (CV Doc. 12; CR Doc. 175) together with a copy of this Order. (ccp)
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandra Cook re #10 Reply (meq)
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY re 6 Response to Motion filed by Sandra Cook. (meq)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandra Cook re #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #7 MOTION (meq)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sandra Cook. (meq)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for an Emergency Ruling on Motion for Release on Bond by Sandra Cook. (meq)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Release on Bond by Sandra Cook. (meq)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Mamoru Max Uballez on behalf of USA (Uballez, Alexander)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Sandra Cook. (meq)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Sandra Cook (meq)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Sandra Cook. (meq)
April 22, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sandra Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Alexander Mamoru Max Uballez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?