State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Newmar Corporation et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Newmar Corporation, Daimler Trucks North America LLC and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv00436
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Summons Issued as to Newmar Corporation. (arp)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 7/29/2020 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 7/22/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/9/2020. (mlt)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Subrogation Property Damages by Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Lang, Darin)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
May 7, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (arp)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee received online: $ 400.00, receipt number ANMDC-7111950 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daimler Trucks North America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daimler Trucks & Buses US Holding, Inc. for Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Lang, Darin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Daimler Trucks North America LLC from Thirteenth Judicial District Court for Cibola County, New Mexico, case number D-1333-CV-2020-00101. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Register of Actions, #4 Exhibit C - SF Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Exhibit D - Newmar Registered Agent Page, #6 Exhibit E - DTNA Registered Agent Page)(Lang, Darin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Newmar Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newmar Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC
Represented By: Darin J. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Julia Hosford Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?