Showmaker v Taos Ski Valley
Plaintiff: Christopher Showmaker
Defendant: Taos Ski Valley
Case Number: 1:2020cv00447
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James A Parker
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 11:00 AM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 6th Floor Courtroom ; Call of the Calendar set for 6/24/2021 at 11:00 AM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 6th Floor Courtroom before District Judge James A. Parker. Jury Selection/Trial set for 7/6/2021 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 6th Floor Courtroom before District Judge James A. Parker. (bap)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 10/01/2020 at 10:30 AM. The purpose of this conference is to check the status of discovery and discuss setting a settlement conference. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 808-6929 [Access Code: 8865421] to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Discovery due by 01/22/2021. Discovery motions due by 02/16/2021. Pretrial motions due by 02/22/2021. Proposed pretrial order due by 06/08/2021. (cm)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 06/30/2020. (cm)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taos Ski Valley Re: Initial Disclosures (McClaugherty, Joe)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Christopher Showmaker (Beshara, Lance)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James A. Parker as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand by Taos Ski Valley. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Christopher Showmaker.(McClaugherty, Joe)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 17. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw. Attorneys Bruce Campbell and Jeffrey Tillman terminated. (cm)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Motion TO WITHDRAW, Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Bruce S. Campbell by Taos Ski Valley. (McClaugherty, Joe)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt B Gilbert on behalf of Taos Ski Valley (Gilbert, Kurt)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 06/30/2020 at 01:30 PM. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 808-6929, Access Code: 8865421, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 06/19/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 06/02/2020. (cm)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00180. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (arp)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Accordingly, Defendant's #7 motion to transfer is GRANTED, and the case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Mexico pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Motion is DENIED in all other respects. (see order) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 5/11/2020) (tln) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/11/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Mon May 11 16:13:20 CDT 2020 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/11/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Christopher Showmaker re #10 Response/Objection to Motion to Dismiss (Beshara, Lance) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/11/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Christopher Showmaker re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beshara, Lance) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/11/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Taos Ski Valley's Motion and Brief to Dismiss and in the Alternative Motion and Brief to Transfer Venue. Responses due by 5/8/2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/28/2020) (tln) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/11/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Tue Apr 28 10:59:34 CDT 2020 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/11/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Christopher Showmaker (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beshara, Lance) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/11/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division () filed by Taos Ski Valley with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Jeffrey M Tillman added to party Taos Ski Valley(pty:dft) (Tillman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/11/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines by Christopher Showmaker. (Beshara, Lance) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/11/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Taos Ski Valley ; served on 2/28/2020. (Beshara, Lance) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/11/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Taos Ski Valley. (bdb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/11/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (bdb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/11/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christopher Showmaker. (Beshara, Lance) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/11/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Taos Ski Valley filed by Christopher Showmaker. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10655775) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Beshara, Lance) Modified on 2/28/2020 (bdb). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 5/11/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Showmaker v Taos Ski Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taos Ski Valley
Represented By: Joe L McClaugherty
Represented By: Jeffrey M Tillman
Represented By: Bruce S Campbell
Represented By: Kurt B Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Showmaker
Represented By: Lance H Beshara
Represented By: Lance Hunter Beshara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?