Groomes v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Rosalie Groomes
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv00493
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Schuenemann on behalf of Social Security Administration (Schuenemann, Melissa)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney served on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (ln)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration served on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (ln)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney General served on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (ln)
May 27, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the Summons and Complaint on the United States. (kfo)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 22, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groomes v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Melissa Schuenemann
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Groomes
Represented By: Benjamin Eilers Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?