Jaramillo v. Arguello et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Ann Jaramillo
Defendant: Victor Aldaz, FNU Spangler, FNU Armijo, Eluid Stan Arguello, Michael Martinez, Roberta Lucero-Ortega, FNU Gonzales, Pete Perez and Christy Vigil
Case Number: 1:2020cv00527
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin granting #6 Motion for Discovery (em)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Discovery to be Utilized in First Judicial District Court by Lisa Ann Jaramillo. (Moskowitz, Lalita)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 11:00 AM in Other before District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal. See Notice for call in information. (anl)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Violations of Civil Rights by Victor Aldaz, Eluid Stan Arguello, FNU Armijo, FNU Gonzales, Roberta Lucero-Ortega, Michael Martinez, Pete Perez, FNU Spangler, Christy Vigil. (Narvaez, Henry)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Victor Aldaz, Eluid Stan Arguello, FNU Armijo, FNU Gonzales, Roberta Lucero-Ortega, Michael Martinez, Pete Perez, FNU Spangler, Christy Vigil of Agreed Upon Extension to File Defendants' Answer to Complaint for Violations of Civil Rights (Narvaez, Henry)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Victor Aldaz, Eluid Stan Arguello, FNU Armijo, FNU Gonzales, Roberta Lucero-Ortega, Michael Martinez, Pete Perez, FNU Spangler, Christy Vigil of Filing of Certified State Court Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Narvaez, Henry)
June 2, 2020 United States District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal and United States Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin assigned. (arp)
June 2, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7147699 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Allen Armijo, Eluid Stan Arguello, Michael Martinez, Deflino Gonzales, Victor Aldaz, Christy Vigil, Roberta Lucero-Ortega, Pete Perez, Dennis Spangler (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Narvaez, Henry)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2020-02548. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Parties and Attorneys, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Narvaez, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaramillo v. Arguello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Aldaz
Represented By: Troy Ward
Represented By: Henry F. Narvaez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Spangler
Represented By: Troy Ward
Represented By: Henry F. Narvaez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Armijo
Represented By: Troy Ward
Represented By: Henry F. Narvaez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eluid Stan Arguello
Represented By: Troy Ward
Represented By: Henry F. Narvaez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Martinez
Represented By: Troy Ward
Represented By: Henry F. Narvaez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Lucero-Ortega
Represented By: Troy Ward
Represented By: Henry F. Narvaez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Gonzales
Represented By: Troy Ward
Represented By: Henry F. Narvaez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Perez
Represented By: Troy Ward
Represented By: Henry F. Narvaez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Vigil
Represented By: Troy Ward
Represented By: Henry F. Narvaez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Ann Jaramillo
Represented By: Corinne Holt
Represented By: Lalita C Moskowitz
Represented By: Leon F Howard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?