Taylor v. City of Carlsbad et al
Plaintiff: Mickey Ray Taylor and Mickey R Taylor
Defendant: John Does and City of Carlsbad
Case Number: 1:2020cv00536
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Karen B Molzen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting #2 Motion to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915. (KBM)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to Cure Defects by 7/6/2020. (KBM)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Mickey Ray Taylor. (ln)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mickey Ray Taylor, Mickey R Taylor. (ln)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales and United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. City of Carlsbad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Carlsbad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mickey Ray Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mickey R Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?