Vela et al v. Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Frances Vela, Reina Vela and Nadine Vela
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC and John Terblanche
Case Number: 1:2020cv00547
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
2 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution: Shawn Stephen Cummings substituted for Matthew T. Tucker (Cummings, Shawn)
July 15, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Terblanche First Interrogatories to Frances Vela (Eaton, Brett) Modified on 7/15/2020 TO REMOVE ABBREVIATIONS (vv).
July 15, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Terblanche First Interrogatories to Reina Vela (Eaton, Brett) Modified on 7/15/2020 TO REMOVE ABBREVIATIONS (vv).
July 15, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Terblanche First Interrogatories to Nadine Vela (Eaton, Brett) Modified on 7/15/2020 TO REMOVE ABBREVIATIONS (vv).
July 15, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC First Interrogatories & First Requests for production to Nadine Vela (Eaton, Brett) Modified on 7/15/2020 TO REMOVE ABBREVIATIONS (vv).
July 15, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC First Interrogatories & First Requests for production to Frances Vela (Eaton, Brett) Modified on 7/15/2020 TO REMOVE ABBREVIATIONS (vv).
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC First Interrogatories & First Request for production to Reina Vela (Eaton, Brett) Modified on 7/15/2020 TO REMOVE ABBREVIATIONS (vv).
July 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea VACATING case management deadlines and settlement conference established during July 1, 2020 scheduling hearing. In light of the Judge Browning's assignment as the Presiding Judge, the Court hereby vacates all case management deadlines and limitations discussed during the telephonic Rule 16(c) hearing as well as vacates the settlement conference. (cbf)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
July 7, 2020 Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, John Terblanche Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Eaton, Brett)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reina Vela for Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (Tucker, Matthew)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on July 1, 2020. (cbf)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 Joint Status Report by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, John Terblanche (Eaton, Brett)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for July 1, 2020 at 03:00 PM. Joint Status Report due by June 26, 2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than July 6, 2020. (cbf)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, John Terblanche. (Eaton, Brett)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC (Eaton, Brett)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, John Terblanche Of Filing State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Eaton, Brett)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett C Eaton on behalf of Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, John Terblanche (Eaton, Brett)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by S Carolyn Ramos on behalf of All Defendants (Ramos, S)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB046935 (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
June 5, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (arp)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, John Terblanche from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2020-01002. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, John Terblanche. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eaton, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vela et al v. Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC
Represented By: Brett C Eaton
Represented By: S Carolyn Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Terblanche
Represented By: Brett C Eaton
Represented By: S Carolyn Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Vela
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Tucker
Represented By: Shawn Stephen Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reina Vela
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Tucker
Represented By: Shawn Stephen Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine Vela
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Tucker
Represented By: Shawn Stephen Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?