Feliciano v. Farias et al
Plaintiff: Roderick Feliciano
Defendant: Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company, Bordier & Guillen Transportation, LLC, FDF Energy Services, LLC and Jose Farias
Case Number: 1:2020cv00574
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. A Rule 16 Settlement Conference is set for 11/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Judge Khalsa. A Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference is set for 10/23/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiff's demand letter is due to Defendant by 10/9/2020. Defendant's counteroffer letter is due to Plaintiff by 10/19/2020. The parties' confidential position statements are due to the Court by 10/21/2020. (kys)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff to seek leave to amend and join additional parties by 8/10/2020. Defendant to seek leave to amend and join additional parties by 8/24/2020. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 10/26/2020. Defendant's expert disclosures due by 12/9/2020. Discovery due by 1/25/2021. Discovery motions due by 2/15/2021. Pretrial motions due by 2/25/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiff to Defendant by 5/10/2021 and from Defendant to the Court by 5/24/2021. (kys)
July 27, 2020 Filing 17 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference held on 7/27/2020. (kys)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 12 and 13. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bordier & Guillen Transportation, LLC of Defendant's First Supplemental Disclosures (Jones, Mary)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 23, 2020 FILED IN ERROR - United States Chief District Judge William P. Johnson assigned. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to case. (arp) Modified on 7/23/2020 (arp).
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bordier & Guillen Transportation, LLC of Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Jones, Mary)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roderick Feliciano for Initial Disclosures (Duran, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Bordier & Guillen Transportation, LLC (Jones, Mary)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Bordier & Guillen Transportation, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) (Jones, Mary)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FDF Energy Services, LLC (Vigil, Charles)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J. Vigil on behalf of FDF Energy Services, LLC (Vigil, Charles)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Personal Injury by Bordier & Guillen Transportation, LLC. (Jones, Mary)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bordier & Guillen Transportation, LLC (Jones, Mary)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 7/17/2020. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/22/2020. (kys) (kys)
June 12, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7165327 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bordier & Guillen Transportation, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Jones, Mary)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
June 12, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bordier & Guillen Transportation, LLC from Tenth Judicial District Court, County of Quay, case number D-1010-CV-2020-00020. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Bordier & Guillen Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feliciano v. Farias et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallmark County Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bordier & Guillen Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Laura K. Vega
Represented By: Donald A. DeCandia
Represented By: Mary E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FDF Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Farias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Feliciano
Represented By: Samantha L. Drum
Represented By: Daniel T. Cornish
Represented By: Michael G Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?