Jim v. CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC
Plaintiff: Adrian Jim
Defendant: CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00618
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 9/24/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Five minutes prior to the start of the Conference, the partiesshall call the AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to theproceedings. Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/31/2020. (smd)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoreCivic, Inc. for CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC. (Oller, Robert)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Adrian Jim.(Oller, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Adrian Jim In Support of Pro Hac Vice Application of Anthony J. Lazzaro (Foty, Don)
July 24, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7226500 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Adrian Jim (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lazzaro, Anthony)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Adrian Jim by Anthony J Lazzaro (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lazzaro, Anthony)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar granting #7 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC answer due 8/7/2020. (smd)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC. (Oller, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Adrian Jim In Support of Pro Hac Vice Application of Hans A. Nilges (Foty, Don)
July 10, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7204713 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Adrian Jim (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Nilges, Hans)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Adrian Jim by Hans Nilges (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Nilges, Hans)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adrian Jim. CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Foty, Don)
June 26, 2020 Summons Issued as to CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC. (dr)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Adrian Jim of filing Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties (Foty, Don)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
June 26, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (dr)
June 25, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7184387 re #1 Complaint filed by Adrian Jim (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Foty, Don)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Adrian Jim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Foty, Don)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jim v. CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC
Represented By: Robert Shawn Oller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Jim
Represented By: Don Foty
Represented By: Hans Nilges
Represented By: Anthony J Lazzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?