Berry v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Edward J. Berry, Jr. and Edward J. Berry
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00643
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-228) by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria (MDL 2741). (kg)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward J. Berry. Monsanto Company served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Houliston, David)
July 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (arp)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Edward J. Berry (Houliston, David)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
July 2, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)
July 1, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7192643 re #1 Complaint filed by Edward J. Berry, Jr. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Houliston, David)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Monsanto Company ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Edward J. Berry, Jr. (Houliston, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Berry, Jr.
Represented By: David M Houliston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Berry
Represented By: David M Houliston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?