Jackson v. MHM Services Inc
Plaintiff: Dennis Jackson, DDS and Dennis Jackson
Defendant: MHM Services Inc d/b/ Centurion Detention Health Services, LLC and MHM Services Inc. doing business as Centurion Detention Health Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00668
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman. Amendments to Pleadings Deadline: 9/24/2020. Plaintiff Expert Designation-1/18/2021; Defendant Expert Designation-2/17/2021; Other Fact Witness Deadline-3/19/2021. Discovery Due 5/3/2021. Motions Deadline 5/3/2021; Motions Response Deadline 5/17/2021; Motions Reply Deadline 5/24/2021. Stipulation Deadline 6/10/2021. Motions in Limine Deadline: 6/18/2021; Motions in Limine Response Deadline: 6/25/2021. Final Pretrial Conference: 6/29/2021 at 8:15 AM. Jury Trial set for 7/12/2021 at 9:00 AM (four days). (kew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 8/25/2020. (kew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Dennis Jackson (Gilpin, Donald)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2020 at 03:00 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman. Connect to the Court at (888) 398-2342; Access Code: 6705030; Security Code: 2533. Other details in Notice. (kew)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION re 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing For Non-Member Attorney by MHM Services Inc. (Oller, Robert)
July 16, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7213322 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by MHM Services Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Oller, Robert)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant MHM Services Inc. by Robert Shawn Oller on behalf of: Joshua L. Waltman Littler Mendelson, P.C. 2425 E. Camelback Road, Suite 900Phoenix, AZ 85016 602-474-3600 Fax 602-926-8949 jlwaltman@littler.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Oller, Robert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by MHM Services Inc.. (Oller, Robert)
July 9, 2020 United States District Judge Scott W. Skavdahl and United States Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman assigned. (dr)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MHM Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent Centene Corp., Other Affiliate MHM Health Professionals, LLC for MHM Services Inc d/b/ Centurion Detention Health Services, LLC. (Oller, Robert) Modified on 7/9/2020 (dr).
July 8, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7201136 re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by MHM Services Inc d/b/ Centurion Detention Health Services, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Oller, Robert)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MHM Services Inc from Thirteenth Judicial District, case number D-1314-CV-2020-00476. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by MHM Services Inc d/b/ Centurion Detention Health Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Jan Millard, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Removal to Federal Court to Adverse Party, #6 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Oller, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. MHM Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Jackson, DDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Jackson
Represented By: Christopher P. Machin
Represented By: Donald G Gilpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Services Inc d/b/ Centurion Detention Health Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert Shawn Oller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Services Inc. doing business as Centurion Detention Health Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert Shawn Oller
Represented By: Joshua L Waltman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?