Tijerina v. New Mexico Corrections Department et al
Plaintiff: Diego Tijerina
Defendant: New Mexico Corrections Department, Jose Cordero and Chris Marquez
Case Number: 1:2020cv00706
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: James A Parker
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Cordero, Chris Marquez, New Mexico Corrections Department for Defendants' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Moulton, Debra)
September 8, 2020 Filing 17 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Diego Tijerina (Quijano, Alyssa) Modified text on 9/9/2020 (bap).
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diego Tijerina Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Quijano, Alyssa)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Cordero, Chris Marquez of Defendants Marquez and Cordero's Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's Firs Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admission (Moulton, Debra)
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James A. Parker as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint for Deprivation of Civil Rights by Jose Cordero, Chris Marquez, New Mexico Corrections Department. (Moulton, Debra)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mlt)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer by Jose Cordero, Chris Marquez, New Mexico Corrections Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Moulton, Debra)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New Mexico Corrections Department (Moulton, Debra)
July 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 9/15/2020 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 9/8/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/26/2020. (mlt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jose Cordero, Chris Marquez, New Mexico Corrections Department. (Moulton, Debra)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jose Cordero, Chris Marquez, New Mexico Corrections Department (Moulton, Debra)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra J. Moulton on behalf of Jose Cordero, Chris Marquez, New Mexico Corrections Department (Moulton, Debra)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB047296 (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diego Tijerina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit July 14, 2020 Email from Debra Moulton Accepting Service)(Quijano, Alyssa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diego Tijerina. Jose Cordero served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit July 14, 2020 Email from Debra Moulton Accepting Service)(Quijano, Alyssa)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 16, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (arp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2020-01191. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Moulton, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tijerina v. New Mexico Corrections Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Corrections Department
Represented By: Debra J. Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Cordero
Represented By: Debra J. Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Marquez
Represented By: Debra J. Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Tijerina
Represented By: Matthew Coyte
Represented By: Alyssa D Quijano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?