Strange v. Prep at Home LLC
Plaintiff: Clinton Strange
Defendant: Prep at Home LLC a New Mexico Domestic Limited Liability Company doing business as The Contractors School and Prep at Home LLC doing business as The Contractors School
Case Number: 1:2020cv00709
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Summons Issued as to Prep at Home LLC. (arp)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint filed by Clinton Strange. (Childress, Sidney) Modified docket text on 8/26/2020 (dr).
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 12) is granted. Plaintiff may file the Second Amended Complaint attached to his Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint within 5 days of entry of this Order. (kmt)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Clinton Strange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Childress, Sidney)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Clinton Strange voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Childress, Sidney)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sidney Childress on behalf of Clinton Strange (Childress, Sidney)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 CM/ECF Pro Se Notification Form electing to receive notification via U.S. postal mail by Clinton Strange. (aek) Modified on 8/18/2020 (arp).
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Amended Complaint by Clinton Strange. (aek)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Prep at Home LLC., filed by Clinton Strange. (aek)
August 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to Prep at Home LLC. (ln)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE re Request for Issuance of Summons by Clinton Strange. (ln)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Judicial Notice of Mailing by Clinton Strange. (aek)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Filing Fee: $ 400, receipt number ALB047315 (snw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
July 17, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (ln)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of The Telephone Consumer Protection Act of 1991 against Prep at Home LLC, filed by Clinton Strange. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strange v. Prep at Home LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prep at Home LLC a New Mexico Domestic Limited Liability Company doing business as The Contractors School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prep at Home LLC doing business as The Contractors School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Strange
Represented By: Sidney Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?