Sanchez v. Alon USA, LP et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Sanchez
Defendant: DK, K E Andrews & Company, 7-Eleven, Inc., Alon USA, LP, John Does, Delek U.S. Holdings Inc., Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC and Alon USA GP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00711
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL by District Judge Martha Vazquez GRANTING #38 Joint Motion to Dismiss. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff's Complaint, and all causes of action that were or could have been asserted therein, are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorney's fees. (gr)
February 4, 2021 Filing 38 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC. (Unruh, Minal)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER to Submit Closing Documents by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. The parties have reached a negotiated settlement in this matter. Closing documents are due 2/25/2021, absent a written motion showing good cause for an extension. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ccp)
January 26, 2021 Filing 36 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing: Settlement Conference held on 1/26/2021. Case settled. Closing documents will be due 2/25/21. (ccp)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #34 Unopposed Motion to Extend Remaining Case Management Deadlines. Discovery due 4/8/21. Pretrial motions due 5/7/21. Proposed Pretrial Order due 7/7/21. (ccp)
January 14, 2021 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Remaining Case Management Deadlines by Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC. (Unruh, Minal)
January 8, 2021 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Sanchez that Plaintiffs Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure, together with all documents produced concurrently therewith (Jackson, Wesley)
December 2, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production (Unruh, Minal)
November 5, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Sanchez for Answers and Responses to Defendant SWCS First Set of Interrogatories and First RFP (Jackson, Wesley)
October 21, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Southwest Convenient Stores Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests (Cheves, Phillip) Modified text on 10/21/20 (bap).
October 16, 2020 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Delek U.S. Holdings Inc. Answer to Interrogatory No. 7 (Cheves, Phillip)
October 5, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production (Unruh, Minal)
October 5, 2020 Filing 27 **FILED IN ERROR** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production (Blake, Neil) Modified on 10/5/2020 (filed in error per attorney Unruh) (cmm).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a Settlement Conference for 1/26/2021 at 09:00 AM remote via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN and SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Discovery due by 3/8/2021. Motions due by 4/8/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/7/2021. (cda)
September 23, 2020 Filing 23 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing: Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 9/23/2020. (cda)
September 22, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC Initial Disclosures (Unruh, Minal)
September 22, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Sanchez Initial Disclosures (Jackson, Wesley)
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 Joint Status Report And Provisional Discovery Plan by Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC (Unruh, Minal)
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 15 and 16. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
September 10, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Sanchez 1st discovery to SW Convenience Stores (Jackson, Wesley)
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Unruh, Minal)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Joseph Sanchez voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Jackson, Wesley)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by September 9, 2020. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Defendant's First Amended Complaint For Damages for Personal Injury by Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC. (Unruh, Minal)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Unruh, Minal)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2020 at 02:45 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 9/16/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/9/2020. (ccp)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendants Alon USA, LP, Alon USA GP, LLC, DK and by Delek U.S. Holdings Inc. (Unruh, Minal)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Defendant Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC is granted leave to amend #1 the Notice of Removal no later than August 19, 2020. (jcm)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB047297 (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal As to Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. by Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC (Unruh, Minal)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip W. Cheves on behalf of Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC (Cheves, Phillip)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC. (Unruh, Minal)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Minal P. Unruh on behalf of Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC (Unruh, Minal)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC (Unruh, Minal)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2020-02954. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Unruh, Minal)
July 16, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Alon USA, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K E Andrews & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-Eleven, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alon USA, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delek U.S. Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Convenience Stores, LLC
Represented By: Phillip W. Cheves
Represented By: Minal P. Unruh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alon USA GP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sanchez
Represented By: Simon A Kubiak
Represented By: Wesley Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?