Garcia et al v. Perry et al
Plaintiff: Pasqual Baylon and Cruz Garcia
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and Mark W Perry
Case Number: 1:2020cv00713
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Joint Status Report is due by 10/7/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 10/14/2020 at 1:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/18/2020. (crc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (mlt)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Alonso, Gabriella)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing answer due 9/8/2020. (ke)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Alonso, Gabriella)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Alonso, Gabriella)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B) (Alonso, Gabriella)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 17, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (arp)
July 17, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7215293 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Alonso, Gabriella)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing from Eleventh JDC, San Juan County, New Mexico, case number D-1116-CV-2020-00681-4. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alonso, Gabriella)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasqual Baylon
Represented By: Brandt E Thrower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cruz Garcia
Represented By: Brandt E Thrower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Gabriella Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark W Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?