Manchester Uptown ABQ, LLC et al v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: MANCHESTER UPTOWN ABQ, LLC, a New Mexico Limited Liability Company, SKYLINE UPTOWN, LLC, a New Mexico Limited Liability Company, Skyline Uptown, LLC and Manchester Uptown ABQ, LLC
Defendant: TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Foreign Company and Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00717
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America re #7 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Wettestad, Jeri)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Wettestad, Jeri)
September 3, 2020 Reset Hearing: Rule 16(c) Hearing reset for 10/28/2020 at 3:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (gr)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RESETTING RULE 16(c) HEARING by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The #12 Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing previously scheduled for 10/29/2020 at 3:00 p.m. MDT, is HEREBY RESET to 10/28/2020 at 3:00 p.m. MDT. Parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. (nmh)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 10/29/2020 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2020. (nmh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Manchester Uptown ABQ, LLC, Skyline Uptown, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Griebel, Patrick)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeri Wettestad on behalf of Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Wettestad, Jeri)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike Allegations in Plaintiffs' Complaint by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Samberg, Amy)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt granting #5 Motion to Extend. (mm)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Deadlines by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Samberg, Amy)
July 20, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7217564 re #1 Notice of Removal, (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Samberg, Amy)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 20, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (arp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Foreign Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty & Surety Company for TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Foreign Company. (Samberg, Amy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Foreign Company (Samberg, Amy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Foreign Company from County of Bernalillo Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2020-03437. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Foreign Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Samberg, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manchester Uptown ABQ, LLC et al v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANCHESTER UPTOWN ABQ, LLC, a New Mexico Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKYLINE UPTOWN, LLC, a New Mexico Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyline Uptown, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy J Theoret
Represented By: Patrick J Griebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manchester Uptown ABQ, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy J Theoret
Represented By: Patrick J Griebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Foreign Company
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Represented By: Jeri Wettestad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?