Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. v. Total Contracting Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.
Defendant: Total Contracting Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00718
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Total Contracting Services, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc..(Menicucci, Michael)
September 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Total Contracting Services, Inc.. (Menicucci, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Total Contracting Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Total Contracting Services, Inc. for Total Contracting Services, Inc.. (Menicucci, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Total Contracting Services, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Menicucci, Michael)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Total Contracting Services, Inc. (arn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kfo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Total Contracting Services, Inc. by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Larson, Derek)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Larson, Derek)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Menicucci on behalf of Total Contracting Services, Inc. (Menicucci, Michael)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.. Total Contracting Services, Inc. served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Larson, Derek)
July 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to Total Contracting Services, Inc. (arp)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 20, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)
July 17, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7216255 re #1 Complaint, filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Larson, Derek)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract against Total Contracting Services, Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Larson, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. v. Total Contracting Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Derek V Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Contracting Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F. Menicucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?