Rodulfo v. Fresenius Medical Care
Plaintiff: Darcel Rodulfo
Defendant: Fresenius Medical Care
Case Number: 1:2020cv00735
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: James A Parker
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 09/17/2020. (cm)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 12/03/2020 at 10:30 AM. The purpose of this conference is to discuss setting a settlement conference. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 808-6929 [Access Code: 8865421] to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Discovery due by 03/15/2021. Discovery Motions due by 04/06/2021. Pretrial Motions due by 04/15/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 07/20/2021. (cm)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James A. Parker as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Darcel Rodulfo (Gilpin, Donald)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by Fresenius Medical Care re #1 Notice of Removal (Notice of Filing Copies of State Court Records and Proceedings) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Toppel, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by September 10, 2020. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 09/17/2020 at 09:30 AM. Joint Status Report due by 09/08/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 08/21/2020. (cm)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fresenius Medical Care (Toppel, Jeffrey)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Fresenius Medical Care. (Toppel, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fresenius Medical Care (Toppel, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Second Judicial District of New Mexico, case number D-202-cv-2020-03598. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Toppel, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7222047 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Fresenius Medical Care (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Toppel, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodulfo v. Fresenius Medical Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darcel Rodulfo
Represented By: Donald G Gilpin
Represented By: Christopher P. Machin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Medical Care
Represented By: Jay Joseph Athey
Represented By: Jeffrey W Toppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?