Curtis et al v. Oliver
Plaintiff: Ranota Q Banks, Stephen P Curtis, Libertarian Party of New Mexico and Chris Luchini
Defendant: Maggie Toulouse Oliver
Material Witness: David Christian Mann
Case Number: 1:2020cv00748
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File (meq)
September 14, 2020 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Fees and Costs, extending to 9/30/2020 by Ranota Q Banks, Stephen P Curtis, Libertarian Party of New Mexico, Chris Luchini. (Wiest, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 30 FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Agreed Final ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Stephen P Curtis by District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
August 17, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER pursuant to the direction of District Judge James O. Browning: The Preliminary Injunction Hearing presently set for August 17, 2020 is hereby vacated as the matter has settled. (cjw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.[],/FONT>
August 16, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION BETWEEN THE PARTIES AND PROPOSED AGREED FINAL ORDER by Ranota Q Banks, Stephen P Curtis, Libertarian Party of New Mexico, Chris Luchini (Wiest, Christopher)
August 14, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION and proposed Agreed Order by and between Plaintiffs and the Dona Ana Clerk as to subpoena and other matters by Ranota Q Banks, Stephen P Curtis, Libertarian Party of New Mexico, Chris Luchini (Wiest, Christopher)
August 14, 2020 Filing 25 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge James O. Browning: Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2020 re #17 MOTION to Quash Dona Ana County Clerk Amanda Lopez Askin's Motion to Quash A Portion of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at the Hearing or Trial in a Civil Action filed by Maggie Toulouse Oliver, #21 MOTION to Quash a portion of subpoena to appear and testify at a hearing or trial in a civil action filed by Linda Stover, #16 First MOTION to Quash Portion of Plaintiff's Subpoena filed by David Christian Mann. (Court Reporter J Bean) (vv)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Support re #17 MOTION to Quash Dona Ana County Clerk Amanda Lopez Askin's Motion to Quash A Portion of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at the Hearing or Trial in a Civil Action, #21 MOTION to Quash a portion of subpoena to appear and testify at a hearing or trial in a civil action, #16 First MOTION to Quash Portion of Plaintiff's Subpoena filed by Maggie Toulouse Oliver. (Lange, Dylan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 First MOTION to Quash Portion of Plaintiff's Subpoena, #21 MOTION to Quash a portion of subpoena to appear and testify at a hearing or trial in a civil action, #17 MOTION to Quash Dona Ana County Clerk Amanda Lopez Askin's Motion to Quash A Portion of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at the Hearing or Trial in a Civil Action and #18 Response and Cross Motion to Compel pursuant to FRCP 45 : Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom - Remote before District Judge James O. Browning. (cjw)NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record.2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior its scheduled start time to allow time for trouble-shooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise; if not using a headset participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.*** REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. ***Public wishing to listen through streaming may follow this process to listen: Individuals seeking audio access to a public hearing must contact the Clerks Office to obtain login credentials for the hearing. Callers should contact the main Clerks Office number for the courthouse where the hearing will be held: Albuquerque (505) 348-2000. If a caller is uncertain as to where the hearing is being held, staff answering the calls may provide that information as well. Staff will 1. Confirm the hearing the caller is asking to participate in is a public hearing, 2. Verify which courtroom will be used and provide the appropriate login credentials. At the stated date and time for the hearing, interested individuals will be able to access the audio stream by visiting the district court website and clicking on the link for the appropriate courtroom: https://www.nmd.uscourts.gov/district-court-audio-streaming-service-dcass[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Quash a portion of subpoena to appear and testify at a hearing or trial in a civil action by Linda Stover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Bernalillo County) (Downey, Natalia)
August 13, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 First MOTION to Quash Portion of Plaintiff's Subpoena, #17 MOTION to Quash Dona Ana County Clerk Amanda Lopez Askin's Motion to Quash A Portion of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at the Hearing or Trial in a Civil Action and Cross Motion to Compel pursuant to FRCP 45 : Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom - Remote before District Judge James O. Browning. (cjw)NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record.2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior its scheduled start time to allow time for trouble-shooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise; if not using a headset participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.*** REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. ***Public wishing to listen through streaming may follow this process to listen: Individuals seeking audio access to a public hearing must contact the Clerks Office to obtain login credentials for the hearing. Callers should contact the main Clerks Office number for the courthouse where the hearing will be held: Albuquerque (505) 348-2000. If a caller is uncertain as to where the hearing is being held, staff answering the calls may provide that information as well. Staff will 1. Confirm the hearing the caller is asking to participate in is a public hearing, 2. Verify which courtroom will be used and provide the appropriate login credentials. At the stated date and time for the hearing, interested individuals will be able to access the audio stream by visiting the district court website and clicking on the link for the appropriate courtroom: https://www.nmd.uscourts.gov/district-court-audio-streaming-service-dcass[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan Kenneth Lange on behalf of Maggie Toulouse Oliver (Lange, Dylan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Quash Dona Ana County Clerk Amanda Lopez Askin's Motion to Quash A Portion of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at the Hearing or Trial in a Civil Action, #16 First MOTION to Quash Portion of Plaintiff's Subpoena and Cross Motion to Compel pursuant to FRCP 45 filed by Ranota Q Banks, Stephen P Curtis, Libertarian Party of New Mexico, Chris Luchini. (Wiest, Christopher)
August 13, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Quash Dona Ana County Clerk Amanda Lopez Askin's Motion to Quash A Portion of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at the Hearing or Trial in a Civil Action by Maggie Toulouse Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Goodin, Nelson)
August 13, 2020 Filing 16 First MOTION to Quash Portion of Plaintiff's Subpoena by David Christian Mann. (Mann, David)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 FILED IN ERROR-First MOTION to Quash Portion of Plaintiff's Subpoena by David Christian Mann. (Mann, David) Modified on 8/13/2020 (vv).
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ranota Q Banks, Stephen P Curtis, Libertarian Party of New Mexico, Chris Luchini. (Wiest, Christopher)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge James O. Browning: Motion Hearing held on 8/7/2020 re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Stephen P Curtis. (Court Reporter S Hilton) (vv)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom - Remote before District Judge James O. Browning. (cjw)NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record.2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior its scheduled start time to allow time for trouble-shooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise; if not using a headset participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.*** REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. ***[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #10 Response to Motion, Redacted Exhibit 3 by Maggie Toulouse Oliver (Lange, Dylan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Maggie Toulouse Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3Sealed Case Participants Only Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Lange, Dylan) Modified to restrict exh 3 per attorney request on 8/7/2020 (bc).
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2020 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom - Remote before District Judge James O. Browning. (cjw)NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record.2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior its scheduled start time to allow time for trouble-shooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise; if not using a headset participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.*** REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. ***[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Ranota Q Banks, Stephen P Curtis, Libertarian Party of New Mexico, Chris Luchini re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Information Sheet for TRO (Wiest, Christopher)
July 31, 2020 United States District Judge James O. Browning assigned. (arp)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Stephen P Curtis. (Curtis, Stephen)
July 28, 2020 Summons Issued as to Maggie Toulouse Oliver. (arp)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # ANMDC-7227620 re: 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Plaintiff Stephen P Curtis (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Stephen P Curtis (Curtis, Stephen)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Stephen P Curtis by Stephen P. Curtis on behalf of: Chris Wiest Chris Wiest, Attorney at Law, PLLC 25 Town Center Blvd, STE 104Crestview Hills, KY 41017 513-257-1895 chris@cwiestlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Curtis, Stephen)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Stephen P Curtis re #1 Complaint (Curtis, Stephen)
July 24, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (arp)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maggie Toulouse Oliver ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Stephen P Curtis. (Curtis, Stephen)
July 23, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7224326 re #1 Complaint filed by Stephen P Curtis (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Curtis, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis et al v. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Toulouse Oliver
Represented By: Dylan Kenneth Lange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranota Q Banks
Represented By: Stephen P. Curtis
Represented By: Christopher D Wiest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen P Curtis
Represented By: Christopher D Wiest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Libertarian Party of New Mexico
Represented By: Stephen P. Curtis
Represented By: Christopher D Wiest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Luchini
Represented By: Stephen P. Curtis
Represented By: Christopher D Wiest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Material witness: David Christian Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?