Health Care Integrity, LLC et al v. Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Conejo and Health Care Integrity, LLC
Defendant: Jane Does, Felicia Adams, John Does, Valory Wangler, Jaylyn Ellis, Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services, Inc., Andrea Walker, Laura Hammons, Mary Poel, Neil Jackson and Christopher Hoover
Case Number: 1:2020cv00750
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC as to Valory Wangler. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC as to Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services, Inc.. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC as to Neil Jackson. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC as to Mary Poel. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC as to Laura Hammons. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC as to Jaylyn Ellis. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC as to Felicia Adams. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC as to Christopher Hoover. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC as to Andrea Walker. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC. Valory Wangler served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC. Neil Jackson served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC. Mary Poel served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC. Laura Hammons served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE by Publication filed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC., SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC. Jaylyn Ellis served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC. Felicia Adams served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC. Christopher Hoover served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Robles, Luis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC. Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services, Inc. served on 8/05/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Robles, Luis) Modified on 8/19/2020 (arp).
August 9, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Complaint against All Defendants., filed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33)(Robles, Luis)
July 28, 2020 Summons Issued as to Felicia Adams, Jaylyn Ellis, Laura Hammons, Christopher Hoover, Neil Jackson, Mary Poel, Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services, Inc., Andrea Walker, Valory Wangler. (arp)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 24, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee received online: $ 400.00, receipt number ANMDC-7224578 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by David Conejo, Health Care Integrity, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robles, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Health Care Integrity, LLC et al v. Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Conejo
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Care Integrity, LLC
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valory Wangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaylyn Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehoboth McKinley Christian Health Care Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Hammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Poel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?