United States of America v. Simones et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James M Simones, Adelina Monnet, Jo Ann Hartman Stockton and Brooky Stockton
Case Number: 1:2020cv00795
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Paul Kelly
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James M Simones. (gr)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION the Court to take Judicial Notice by James M Simones. (gr)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Request for Production by James M Simones. (gr)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Request for Production by James M Simones. (gr) Modified text on 8/21/2020 add error language due to document filed wrong (gr).
August 13, 2020 Summons Issued as to Jo Ann Hartman Stockton, Adelina Monnet, James M Simones, Brooky Stockton on Amended Complaint. (dr)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brooky Stockton, Jo Ann Hartman Stockton, James M Simones, Adelina Monnet., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Blacker, Jonathan)
August 10, 2020 United States Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jo Ann Hartman Stockton, Adelina Monnet, James M Simones, Brooky Stockton ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Blacker, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Simones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M Simones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adelina Monnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Ann Hartman Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooky Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan L Blacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?