Trujillo v. Bittenger et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Trujillo
Defendant: Crystal Rivera, Chour Lung, Theresa Bittenger, Michelle Fruizer and Timothy Hatch
Case Number: 1:2020cv00826
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Karen B Molzen
Referring Judge: Kea W Riggs
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting #2 Motion to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915. (KBM)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Inmate Account Statement by Joseph Trujillo re #3 Order to Cure Defects. (cmm)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to Cure Defects by 10/5/2020. (KBM)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Joseph Trujillo. (ln)
August 17, 2020 United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs and United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (ln)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joseph Trujillo. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. Bittenger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chour Lung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Bittenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Fruizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?