Romero v. Government Employees Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Romero
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company and The Hartford Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00830
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Discovery due by 5/5/2021. Pretrial Motions due by 6/7/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due to Court by 9/22/2021. (kfo)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 10/6/2020. (kfo)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leslie Romero. The Hartford Insurance Company served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Voorhees, Scott)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Status Report by Government Employees Insurance Company (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to The Hartford Insurance Company. (dr)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 9/25/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
August 19, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr) Modified on 8/20/2020 (arp).
August 19, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 6 (Santa Fe) to 1 (Albuquerque). (dr)
August 19, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7264810 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Mitchell, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J O'Brien on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company (O'Brien, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Government Employees Insurance Company for Government Employees Insurance Company. (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Mitchell on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Mitchell, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Government Employees Insurance Company from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2020-00348. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Government Employees Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Mitchell
Represented By: Daniel J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Romero
Represented By: Scott F. Voorhees
Represented By: M. Michelle Aucoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?