Gilmore et al v. Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico et al
Plaintiff: Vickie Gilmore and La'Vonte Flowers
Defendant: Robert Davie, National Collegiate Athletic Association and Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico
Case Number: 1:2020cv00853
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
2 Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers. Refiled due to original #28 PDF being corrupt. (kg)
October 16, 2020 Filing 28 ***Document has been sealed because it is a corrupt PDF file. See Document #29 .*** AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants., filed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers. (Stout, Mark) Modified text on 10/20/2020 (kg).
October 7, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by CaraLyn Banks on behalf of Robert Davie (Banks, CaraLyn)
October 2, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by La'Vonte Flowers, Vickie Gilmore Notice of Stipulation for Plaintiffs to File Its 2nd Amended Complaint and Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule (Stout, Andrew)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting #20 Motion to Extend (vv)
September 25, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by La'Vonte Flowers, Vickie Gilmore Notice of Appointment of Co-Personal Representatives of the Wrongful Death Estate of Nahje Flowers, Deceased (Stout, Mark)
September 23, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Shanor on behalf of Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico (Shanor, Stephen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Violations of 42 USC 1983, Title VI; and Wrongful Death and Petition for Appt of Co-Personal Reps of Wrongful Death Estate of Nahje Flowers, Deceased against All Defendants., filed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers. (Stout, Mark)
September 16, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 18. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Time to File Responsive Pleading by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Thompson, Rufus)
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association by Rufus E. Thompson on behalf of: Autumn C. Gear Barnes & Thornburg, LLP 225 S. Sixth Street, Suite 2800Minneapolis, MN 55402-4662 612-333-21111 Fax 612-333-6798 autumn.gear@btlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Thompson, Rufus)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association by Rufus E. Thompson on behalf of: Benjamin T. Pendroff Barnes & Thornburg, LLP 2121 North Pearl Street, Suite 700Dallas, TX 75201-2469 214-258-4200 Fax 214-258-4199 bpendroff@btlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Thompson, Rufus)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association by Rufus E. Thompson on behalf of: Victor D. Vital Barnes & Thornburg, LLP 2121 North Pearl Street, Suite 700Dallas, TX 75201-2469 214-258-4200 Fax 214-258-4199 victor.vital@btlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Thompson, Rufus)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Rufus E. Thompson on behalf of National Collegiate Athletic Association (Thompson, Rufus)
September 11, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7304009 re: # 15 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Thompson, Rufus)
September 11, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7304026 re: # 16 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Thompson, Rufus)
September 11, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7304018 re: # 17 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Thompson, Rufus)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers. National Collegiate Athletic Association served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Stout, Andrew)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers. Robert Davie served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Stout, Andrew)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers. Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Stout, Andrew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by La'Vonte Flowers, Vickie Gilmore Of Good Standing of Associated Counsel for Plaintiffs (Stout, Mark)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs La'Vonte Flowers, Vickie Gilmore by Mark Stout on behalf of: Laura Mullins Pintas & Mullins Law Firm 368 W. Huron St., Ste. 100Chicago, IL 60654 312-488-2000 laura@pintas.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stout, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs La'Vonte Flowers, Vickie Gilmore by Mark Stout on behalf of: Mika Hilaire Equal Rights Law Group 15233 Ventura Boulevard, Ste. 420Sherman Oaks, CA 91403 818-305-6297 mika@equalrightslawgroup.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stout, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs La'Vonte Flowers, Vickie Gilmore by Mark Stout on behalf of: John Duff Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP 719 S. Shoreline Blvd.Corpus Christi, TX 78401 361-882-1612 hmgservice@hmglawfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stout, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs La'Vonte Flowers, Vickie Gilmore by Mark Stout on behalf of: Marion M. Reilly Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP 719 S. Shoreline Blvd.Corpus Christi, TX 78401 361-882-1612 hmgservice@hmglawfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stout, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs La'Vonte Flowers, Vickie Gilmore by Mark Stout on behalf of: T. Christopher Pinedo Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP 719 S. ShorelineCorpus Christi, TX 78401 361-882-1612 hmgservice@hmglawfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stout, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs La'Vonte Flowers, Vickie Gilmore by Mark Stout on behalf of: Ben Crump Ben Crump Law, PLLC 122 S. Calhoun St.Tallahassee, FL 32301 850-224-2020 court@bencrump.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stout, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs La'Vonte Flowers, Vickie Gilmore by Mark Stout on behalf of: Robert Hilliard Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP 719 S. Shoreline Blvd.Corpus Christi, TX 78401 361-882-1612 Fax 361-882-3015 hmgservice@hmglawfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stout, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Violations of 42 USC 1983, Title VI; Wrongful Death, and Petition for Appt of Co-Personal Reps of Wrongful Death Estate of Nahje Flowers, Deceased against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Order to Appoint Co-Personal Representatives of the Wrongful Death Estate of Nahje Flowers, Deceased)(Stout, Mark)
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7274650 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stout, Mark)
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7274616 re: # 2 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stout, Mark)
August 25, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7274587 re #1 Complaint, filed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stout, Mark)
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7274725 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stout, Mark)
August 25, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp)
August 25, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (arp)
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7274746 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stout, Mark)
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7274737 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stout, Mark)
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7274687 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stout, Mark)
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7274672 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Vickie Gilmore, La'Vonte Flowers (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stout, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore et al v. Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Davie
Represented By: CaraLyn Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Represented By: Rufus E. Thompson
Represented By: Benjamin T. Pendroff
Represented By: Autumn C. Gear
Represented By: Nathan T Nieman
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Martinez
Represented By: Victor D. Vital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico
Represented By: Chelsea Rae Green
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Gilmore
Represented By: Andrew Stout
Represented By: Marion M. Reilly
Represented By: John C. Duff
Represented By: Laura Mullins
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Represented By: Ben Crump
Represented By: T. Christopher Pinedo
Represented By: Mark Hilaire
Represented By: Mark Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'Vonte Flowers
Represented By: Andrew Stout
Represented By: Marion M. Reilly
Represented By: John C. Duff
Represented By: Laura Mullins
Represented By: Robert Hilliard
Represented By: Ben Crump
Represented By: T. Christopher Pinedo
Represented By: Mark Hilaire
Represented By: Mark Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?