Paduano et al. v. Al Engineers, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Linda Paduano and John Paduano
Defendant: Al Engineers, Inc., AFPG American Fire Protection Group, Black and White Corporations, Western States Fire Protection Company, Alternatives in Engineering, Inc., Melissa Kirby, Jeff Crouch and John Does
Case Number: 1:2020cv00859
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Kea W Riggs
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by John Paduano, Linda Paduano re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Linda Paduano, John Paduano (Gentile, Robert)
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by John Paduano, Linda Paduano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Gentile, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by AFPG American Fire Protection Group, Western States Fire Protection Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Najjar, Jared)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER VACATING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference previously set for 10/8/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Khalsa, and all associated deadlines as set forth in the Court's Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 6), are vacated, to be reset upon further Order of the Court if necessary. (kmt)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by John Paduano, Linda Paduano. (Gentile, Robert)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by AFPG American Fire Protection Group. (Najjar, Jared)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Western States Fire Protection Company re 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, of Attorneys in Good Standing (Najjar, Jared)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Western States Fire Protection Company by Jared Daniel Albert Najjar on behalf of: Clinton L. Coberly Hall & Evans, LLC 1001 17th St., Suite 300Denver, CO 80202 303-628-3300 Fax 303-628-3368 CoberlyC@hallevans.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Najjar, Jared)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 31, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7285265 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Western States Fire Protection Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Najjar, Jared)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 9/17/2020. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 9/28/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 10/8/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call the Court's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/2/2020. (kmt)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Western States Fire Protection Company. (Najjar, Jared)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Western States Fire Protection Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Najjar, Jared)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western States Fire Protection Company identifying Corporate Parent APi Group, Inc. for Western States Fire Protection Company. (Najjar, Jared)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Western States Fire Protection Company from First Judicial District, Rio Arriba County, case number D-117-CV-2020-00263. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Western States Fire Protection Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Najjar, Jared)
August 26, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7277928 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Western States Fire Protection Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Najjar, Jared)
August 26, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paduano et al. v. Al Engineers, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Engineers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFPG American Fire Protection Group
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black and White Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western States Fire Protection Company
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Represented By: Clinton L. Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternatives in Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Paduano
Represented By: Michael P Jasso
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Represented By: Lawrence A Junker
Represented By: Robert Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paduano
Represented By: Michael P Jasso
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Represented By: Lawrence A Junker
Represented By: Robert Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?