NMSURF, Inc. v. City of Santa Fe
Plaintiff: NMSURF, Inc.
Defendant: City of Santa Fe
Case Number: 1:2020cv00891
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred: #7 MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief (mb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief by NMSURF, Inc.. (Glassman, Richard)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File until 10/16/2020 (mjh)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer and Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary and Injunctive Relief by City of Santa Fe. (Martinez, Marcos)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcos D. Martinez on behalf of City of Santa Fe (Martinez, Marcos)
September 14, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief (anl)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NMSURF, Inc.. City of Santa Fe served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Glassman, Richard)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief by NMSURF, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhbit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9) (Glassman, Richard)
September 4, 2020 Summons Issued as to City of Santa Fe. (arp)
September 1, 2020 United States District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal and United States Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin assigned. (arp)
September 1, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7286218 re #1 Complaint, filed by NMSURF (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Glassman, Richard)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declatory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against City of Santa Fe ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by NMSURF. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1-3)(Glassman, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NMSURF, Inc. v. City of Santa Fe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Fe
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NMSURF, Inc.
Represented By: Richard S. Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?