Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Todd Lopez
Defendant: Phillip Nickse, Farmington Opertations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc. and Farmington Operations, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00958
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Judith C Herrera
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical PI Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 23 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza: Status Conference held on 11/19/2020. (crc)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 11/19/2020, at 1:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. This Status Conference is being held in lieu of the vacated Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (crc)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Joint Motion to Stay All Discovery by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ke)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Vacate by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for November 19, 2020, is hereby vacated. Initial Scheduling Order #7 and all accompanying deadlines are also vacated. (ke)
November 17, 2020 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Stay All Discovery by Todd Lopez. (Sedillo, Carlos)
November 17, 2020 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Vacate Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Todd Lopez. (Sedillo, Carlos)
November 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose R Blanton on behalf of All Defendants (Blanton, Jose)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER of Consolidation by District Judge Judith C. Herrera Consolidating Motions to Remand for decision in the following cases: 20-cv-00958-JCH/CG: Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc., et al., 20-cv-00961-JB-SCY; Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc., et al., 20-cv-00962-SCY-LF; Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc., et al., 20-cv-00963-LF-GJF; Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc., et al., 20-cv-00964-JAP-SCY; Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc., et al., 20-cv-01080-JFR-LF; and Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc., et al., 20-cv-01083-JHR-LF. (baw)
November 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Todd Lopez re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Todd Lopez (Sedillo, Carlos)
November 11, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Todd Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Maglioli Complaint) (Sedillo, Carlos)
October 29, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Coronel, Patrick)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 8 and 10. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Todd Lopez. (Sedillo, Carlos)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 11/12/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 11/19/2020 at 1:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/20/2020. (ke)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Life Care Centers of America, Inc.. (Croasdell, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Life Care Center of Farmington. (Croasdell, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Phillip Nickse. (Croasdell, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 FILED IN ERROR ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Life Care Centers of America, Inc.. (Croasdell, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/29/2020 (ln).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Life Care Centers of America, Inc. Notice of Removal from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2020-01779. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Life Care Centers of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Coronel, Patrick)
September 21, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7318843 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Life Care Centers of America, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Coronel, Patrick)
September 21, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Nickse
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmington Opertations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Center of Farmington
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmington Operations, LLC
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Lopez
Represented By: Nichole Lynn Henry
Represented By: Joshua K Conaway
Represented By: Carlos E Sedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?