Hegarty v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stacy Hegarty
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. and CooperSurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00970
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical PI Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Cooper Companies, Inc. for CooperSurgical, Inc.; Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC. (Ramos, S)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. Limited Entry of Appearance and Notice of Agreed Extension of Time (Ramos, S)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Hegarty. Teva Women's Health, LLC served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Kaufman, Justin) Modified text on 11/4/2020 (vh).
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Hegarty. Teva Women's Health, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health LLC served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Kaufman, Justin) Modified text on 11/4/2020 (vh).
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Hegarty. Teva Pharmaceuticals served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Kaufman, Justin) Modified text on 11/4/2020 (vh).
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Hegarty. CooperSurgical, Inc (subsidiary of Cooper Companies) served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020.(Kaufman, Justin) Modified text on 11/4/2020 (vh).
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Hegarty. The Cooper Companies, Inc. served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Kaufman, Justin) Modified text on 11/4/2020 (vh).
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Stacy Hegarty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order) (Kaufman, Justin)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Stacy Hegarty voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Kaufman, Justin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Stacy Hegarty of Good Standing (Kaufman, Justin)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Stacy Hegarty by Justin Ross Kaufman on behalf of: Randi Kassan Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC 100 Garden City PlazaGarden City, NY 11530 516-741-5600 Fax 516-741-0128 rkassan@thesandersfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kaufman, Justin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Stacy Hegarty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaufman, Justin)
September 22, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr)
September 22, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7320218 re #1 Complaint filed by Stacy Hegarty (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaufman, Justin)
September 22, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dr)
September 22, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7320914 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Stacy Hegarty (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaufman, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hegarty v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Brett C Eaton
Represented By: S Carolyn Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Represented By: Brett C Eaton
Represented By: S Carolyn Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC
Represented By: Brett C Eaton
Represented By: S Carolyn Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Brett C Eaton
Represented By: S Carolyn Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Brett C Eaton
Represented By: S Carolyn Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Hegarty
Represented By: Rosalind Bienvenu
Represented By: Caren I Friedman
Represented By: Justin Ross Kaufman
Represented By: Randi Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?