Riley et al v. Spangler et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Dilallo and Snooky Riley
Defendant: Vincent Vigil, New Mexico Corrections Department, Western New Mexico Correctional Facility, Mary Spangler, Denise Gonzales, Jason Baca, Victor Aldaz, Leon Martinez, John Gay, Christy Vigil, State of New Mexico and Alisha Tafoya Lucero
Case Number: 1:2020cv00983
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kea W Riggs
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Victor Aldaz, Jason Baca, John Gay, Denise Gonzales, Leon Martinez, New Mexico Corrections Department, State of New Mexico, Alisha Tafoya Lucero, Christy Vigil, Vincent Vigil, Western New Mexico Correctional Facility. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Shanor, Stephen)
November 18, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mary Spangler. (Olivas, Sean)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Mary Spangler re #7 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court of Agreed Upon Extension (Olivas, Sean)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Victor Aldaz, Jason Baca, John Gay, Denise Gonzales, Leon Martinez, New Mexico Corrections Department, State of New Mexico, Alisha Tafoya Lucero, Christy Vigil, Vincent Vigil, Western New Mexico Correctional Facility re #7 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court (Shanor, Stephen)
October 29, 2020 Filing 9 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE by Victor Aldaz, Jason Baca, John Gay, Denise Gonzales, Leon Martinez, New Mexico Corrections Department, State of New Mexico, Alisha Tafoya Lucero, Christy Vigil, Vincent Vigil, Western New Mexico Correctional Facility re #7 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court (Shanor, Stephen) Modified on 10/30/2020 filed in error as there is no signature. Atty will resubmit.(cmm).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough VACATING the Scheduling Conference set for 12/03/2020, as well as all corresponding deadlines in #5 Initial Scheduling Order. The Court will reset the Scheduling Conference following resolution of #7 Motion to Remand. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cm)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jennifer Dilallo, Snooky Riley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Moskowitz, Lalita)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Victor Aldaz, John Gay, Denise Gonzales, New Mexico Corrections Department, State of New Mexico, Alisha Tafoya Lucero, Vincent Vigil, Western New Mexico Correctional Facility (Shanor, Stephen)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/03/2020 at 03:30 PM. Joint Status Report due by 11/23/2020. (cm)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Victor Aldaz, Jason Baca, John Gay, Denise Gonzales, Leon Martinez, New Mexico Corrections Department, State of New Mexico, Alisha Tafoya Lucero, Christy Vigil, Vincent Vigil, Western New Mexico Correctional Facility. (Shanor, Stephen)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Mary Spangler Consent to Removal (Olivas, Sean)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Olivas on behalf of Mary Spangler (Olivas, Sean)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Leon Martinez, Jason Baca, Christy Vigil from First Judicial District, case number D101CV202001303. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Leon Martinez, Jason Baca, Christy Vigil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shanor, Stephen)
September 25, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7327457 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Leon Martinez, Jason Baca, Christy Vigil (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Shanor, Stephen)
September 25, 2020 United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley et al v. Spangler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Vigil
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Chelsea Rae Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Corrections Department
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Chelsea Rae Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western New Mexico Correctional Facility
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Chelsea Rae Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Spangler
Represented By: Sean Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Gonzales
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Chelsea Rae Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Baca
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Chelsea Rae Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Aldaz
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Chelsea Rae Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Martinez
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Chelsea Rae Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gay
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Chelsea Rae Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Vigil
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Chelsea Rae Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Chelsea Rae Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisha Tafoya Lucero
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Chelsea Rae Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Dilallo
Represented By: Taylor Smith
Represented By: Lalita C Moskowitz
Represented By: Leon F Howard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snooky Riley
Represented By: Taylor Smith
Represented By: Lalita C Moskowitz
Represented By: Leon F Howard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?