Rodriguez-Olalde v. United States of America
Petitioner: Williams Rodriguez-Olalde
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01102
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: James A Parker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice of Appendix B by Williams Rodriguez-Olalde (vv)
December 21, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Williams Rodriguez-Olalde (vv)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Williams Rodriguez-Olalde (vv)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT SHOW-CAUSE RESPONSE by 1/20/21 and denying as moot #6 MOTION to Extend (other) filed by Williams Rodriguez-Olalde by Senior District Judge James A. Parker. (bap)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order to Show Cause. Mail sent to CIM-II Facility for Guiliermo Garcia (bap)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION (Application) for Enlargement of Time by Williams Rodriguez-Olalde. (bap)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Guillermo Garcia (bap)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable "Released on 10/27/20" re #3 Order to Show Cause. Mail sent to William Rodriguez-Olalde (bap)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Senior District Judge James A. Parker that Petitioner Show Cause Response due by 11/30/2020. (bap)
October 27, 2020 United States District Judge James A. Parker and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (ln)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Petition for 2241 Relief by Williams Rodriguez-Olalde (ln)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Williams Rodriguez-Olalde. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Olalde v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Williams Rodriguez-Olalde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?