Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Todd Lopez
Defendant: Farmington Operations, LLC, Phillip Nickse, Life Care Center of Farmington and Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01149
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical PI Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Strike #13 Response, to Notice of Supplemental Authority Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Strike filed by Todd Lopez. (Sedillo, Carlos)
December 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike #13 Response, to Notice of Supplemental Authority by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse. (Waleko, Alexandra)
December 22, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority re #10 Notice (Other), filed by Todd Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fourth Amendment to the Declaration, #2 Exhibit Fourth Advisory Opinion 20-04) (Sedillo, Carlos)
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Todd Lopez re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Todd Lopez (Sedillo, Carlos)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Todd Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Maglioli Complaint) (Sedillo, Carlos)
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse re #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Waleko, Alexandra)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Beerle, Sandra)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Waleko, Alexandra)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Todd Lopez. (Sedillo, Carlos)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Coronel on behalf of All Defendants (Coronel, Patrick)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Phillip Nickse. (Beerle, Sandra)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington. (Beerle, Sandra)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Life Care Centers of America, Inc.. (Beerle, Sandra)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2020-02118. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Ex C)(Coronel, Patrick)
November 6, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7395415 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Life Care Center of Farmington, Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Coronel, Patrick)
November 6, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmington Operations, LLC
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Nickse
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Center of Farmington
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Lopez
Represented By: Nichole Lynn Henry
Represented By: Joshua K Conaway
Represented By: Carlos E Sedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?