Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Aaron Trujillo, Estate of George William Ward and Todd Lopez
Defendant: Phillip Nickse, Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Centers of America, Inc. and Life Care Center of Farmington
Case Number: 1:2020cv01159
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical PI Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Strike #15 Response, to Notice of Supplemental Authority Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Strike filed by Todd Lopez. (Sedillo, Carlos)
December 28, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike #15 Response, to Notice of Supplemental Authority by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse. (Waleko, Alexandra)
December 22, 2020 Filing 15 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority re #11 Notice (Other), filed by Todd Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fourth Amendment to the Declaration, #2 Exhibit Fourth Advisory Opinion 20-04) (Sedillo, Carlos)
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Todd Lopez re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Todd Lopez (Sedillo, Carlos)
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Todd Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Maglioli Complaint) (Sedillo, Carlos)
December 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse re #1 Notice of Removal, #10 Response in Opposition to Motion, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Waleko, Alexandra)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Waleko, Alexandra)
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough finding good cause to extend the time to issue the scheduling order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b). The Court will delay the issuance of its Initial Scheduling Order pending resolution of #7 Motion to Remand. [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cm)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Todd Lopez. (Sedillo, Carlos)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Coronel on behalf of All Defendants (Coronel, Patrick)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Phillip Nickse. (Beerle, Sandra)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington. (Beerle, Sandra)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Life Care Centers of America, Inc.. (Beerle, Sandra)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 9, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2020-01941. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Ex C)(Coronel, Patrick)
November 6, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7396651 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Life Care Center of Farmington, Farmington Operations, LLC, Estate of George William Ward, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Coronel, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Aaron Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of George William Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Lopez
Represented By: Carlos E Sedillo
Represented By: Nichole Lynn Henry
Represented By: Joshua K Conaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Nickse
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmington Operations, LLC
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Center of Farmington
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?