Martinez v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Martinez
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01252
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James A Parker
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical PI Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The Court will reset a scheduling conference at the conclusion of settlement discussions if needed. (smd)
January 14, 2021 Filing 18 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Scheduling Conference held on 1/14/2021. The Court found good cause to delay entry of a scheduling order. (smd)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T conference line at (888) 363 4735, Access Code 2387395, five minutes prior to the hearing to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (smd) Modified text 1/15/2021 (bap).
January 8, 2021 Filing 16 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Company (Ferguson, Kenneth)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AMENDING DUE DATE FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report by Friday, January 8, 2021, rather than on January 4, 2021. The Rule 16 hearing remains as scheduled on January 14, 2021. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (smd)
December 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 5 and 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
December 9, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Johnson & Johnson Company. (Ferguson, Kenneth)
December 9, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ethicon, Inc.. (Ferguson, Kenneth)
December 9, 2020 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Company by Kenneth Ferguson on behalf of: Sarah E. Johnston Barnes & Thornburg LLP 2029 Century Park East, Suite 300Los Angeles, CA 90067-2904 310-284-3798 sjohnston@btlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Ferguson, Kenneth)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 9, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7446320 re: # 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ferguson, Kenneth)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cynthia Martinez (Roach, James)
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James A. Parker as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Company Certification of Good Standing (Ferguson, Kenneth)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Company (Ferguson, Kenneth)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 1/14/2021 at 01:00 PM in Albuquerque before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Five minutes prior to the start of the Conference, the parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/24/2020. (smd)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 3, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (dr)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ethicon, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon, Inc.. (Ferguson, Kenneth)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson from 2nd Jud. Dist. Ct. of Bernalillo Cty, case number D-202-cv-2020-02707. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferguson, Kenneth)
December 2, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7434238 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ferguson, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Ferguson
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kenneth Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Company
Represented By: Kenneth Ferguson
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Martinez
Represented By: James T. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?