Donald J. Trump for President, Inc v. Toulouse Oliver et al
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump for President, Inc
Defendant: Electors of New Mexico, State Canvassing Board of New Mexico and Maggie Toulouse Oliver
Intervenor: DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee
Case Number: 1:2020cv01289
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez FINDING AS MOOT #37 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Plaintiff's Notice [Doc. #36 ], this case is dismissed without prejudice and shall be closed; Plaintiff's Motion [Doc. #37 ] accordingly is found as moot. (gr)
January 11, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary Mtn to Dismiss by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Caruso, Mark)
January 11, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc (Caruso, Mark)
January 8, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss by DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee. (Calderon, Melissa)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez GRANTING #12 MOTION to Intervene. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the DNC's Motion to Intervene as Defendants and Memorandum of Law in Support [Doc. 12] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the DNC wishes to pursue its proposed motion to dismiss, which is attached as an exhibit to the DNC's Motion, it must file the motion to dismiss as a separate document. (laz)
January 5, 2021 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 Complaint, for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee. (Calderon, Melissa)
January 5, 2021 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maggie Toulouse Oliver, State Canvassing Board of New Mexico re #31 Answer to Complaint, and Motion to Dismiss (Maestas, Tania)
January 5, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint and Motion to Dismiss by Maggie Toulouse Oliver, State Canvassing Board of New Mexico. Related document: #9 Amended Complaint, filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc, #1 Complaint, filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Maestas, Tania)
January 5, 2021 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc Cert Of Service Opposition to Mtn to Intervene (Caruso, Mark)
January 5, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Intervene Plts Opposition to Mtn to Intervene filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Caruso, Mark)
January 4, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE by DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee Of Good Standing of Counsel from Perkins Coie, LLP seeking to appear Pro Hac Vice (Calderon, Melissa)
December 23, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION re 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, by DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee (Brailey, Emily)
December 23, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION re 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, by DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee (Elias, Marc)
December 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Tania Maestas on behalf of Maggie Toulouse Oliver (Maestas, Tania)
December 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J Caruso on behalf of Donald J. Trump for President, Inc (Caruso, Mark)
December 23, 2020 Filing 19 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Intervenor DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee by Torryn Taylor (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Taylor, Torryn)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 18 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Intervenor DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee by Matthew Gordon (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Gordon, Matthew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by District Judge Martha Vazquez. The Court further finds that, given Plaintiff's decision to amend rather than proceed with his original filing, there is no basis for an expedited briefing schedule. Accordingly, the briefing deadlines set forth in D.N.M. Local Rule 7.4(a) shall apply to Plaintiff's Amended Motion. (laz)
December 23, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7467617 re: # 18 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Gordon, Matthew)
December 23, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7467651 re: # 19 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Taylor, Torryn)
December 23, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7467828 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Caruso, Mark)
December 22, 2020 Filing 16 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Intervenor DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee by Jacob D Shelly (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Shelly, Jacob)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 15 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Intervenor DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee by Uzoma Nkem Nkwonta (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Nkwonta, Uzoma)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 14 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Intervenor DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee by Marc E Elias (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Elias, Marc)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 13 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Intervenor DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee by Emily Brailey (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Brailey, Emily)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Intervene by DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed MTD) (Calderon, Melissa)
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc Cert of Service (Caruso, Mark)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc Cert Of Service H. Baldera (Caruso, Mark)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against all Defendants, filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Caruso, Mark) Modified text on 12/23/2020 changed parties the Amended Complaint is against. (gr).
December 22, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7467354 re: # 16 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Shelly, Jacob)
December 22, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7467317 re: # 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Brailey, Emily)
December 22, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7467345 re: # 15 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Nkwonta, Uzoma)
December 22, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7467339 re: # 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Elias, Marc)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Elise Calderon on behalf of DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee (Calderon, Melissa)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affadavit Affidavit of Service served on Hector Balderas Attorney General on 12/17/2020, filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Caruso, Mark)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc Cert of Good Standing (Caruso, Mark)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President, Inc by Mark J Caruso on behalf of: Michael Smith 433 Belle Grove Dr. P.O. Box 833022Richardson TX 75080 6147153900 michael@taalaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Caruso, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fax Confirmation, #2 Exhibit Fax Confirmation)(Caruso, Mark)
December 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to Maggie Toulouse Oliver. (arp)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule by District Judge Martha Vazquez. Response Due 12/24/2020. Reply Due 12/28/2020. See order for specifics. (gr)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION for Issuance Issuance of Summons by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Caruso, Mark) Modified text on 12/16/2020 add error language. Advised attorney of procedure for issuance of summonses (gr).
December 15, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7454727 re #1 Complaint, filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Caruso, Mark)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald J. Trump for President, Inc ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet TRO Information, #3 Affidavit Verification, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Caruso, Mark)
December 14, 2020 United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald J. Trump for President, Inc v. Toulouse Oliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electors of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Canvassing Board of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Toulouse Oliver
Represented By: Dylan Kenneth Lange
Represented By: Tania Maestas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump for President, Inc
Represented By: Mark J Caruso
Represented By: Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee
Represented By: Jacob D Shelly
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Torryn Taylor
Represented By: Matthew Gordon
Represented By: Paul Melendres
Represented By: Melissa Elise Calderon
Represented By: Uzoma Nkem Nkwonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?