First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company v. 610 Central, LLC et al
Plaintiff: First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company
Defendant: James Colby Peterson, Steven L. Coe, CLT, LLC, Larry I. Garcia, The LPG 2012 Irrevocable Trust, The Larry I. Garcia and Patricia Pearlene Garcia Trust, Pearline Garcia, 610 Central, LLC, JCP Investments, LLC, Rolling' Downtown, LLC and Pearlene Garcia
Case Number: 1:2020cv01312
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rufus E. Thompson on behalf of 610 Central, LLC, CLT, LLC, Steven L. Coe, Larry I. Garcia, Pearlene Garcia, JCP Investments, LLC, James Colby Peterson, Rolling' Downtown, LLC, The LPG 2012 Irrevocable Trust, The Larry I. Garcia and Patricia Pearlene Garcia Trust (Thompson, Rufus)
December 29, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. The LPG 2012 Irrevocable Trust served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (DeCandia, Donald)
December 29, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. The Larry I. Garcia and Patricia Pearlene Garcia Trust served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (DeCandia, Donald)
December 29, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Steven L. Coe served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (DeCandia, Donald)
December 29, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Rolling' Downtown, LLC served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (DeCandia, Donald)
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Pearlene Garcia served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (DeCandia, Donald)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Larry I. Garcia served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (DeCandia, Donald)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. JCP Investments, LLC served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (DeCandia, Donald)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. James Colby Peterson served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (DeCandia, Donald)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. CLT, LLC served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (DeCandia, Donald)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. 610 Central, LLC served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (DeCandia, Donald)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
December 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (arp)
December 18, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (arp)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company re #1 Complaint, of filing Civil Cover Sheet (DeCandia, Donald)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent First Citizens BancShares, Inc. for First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. (DeCandia, Donald)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Breach of Contract against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeCandia, Donald)
December 17, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7460495 re #1 Complaint, filed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(DeCandia, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company v. 610 Central, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Colby Peterson
Represented By: Rufus E. Thompson
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L. Coe
Represented By: Rufus E. Thompson
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLT, LLC
Represented By: Rufus E. Thompson
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry I. Garcia
Represented By: Rufus E. Thompson
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The LPG 2012 Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Rufus E. Thompson
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Larry I. Garcia and Patricia Pearlene Garcia Trust
Represented By: Rufus E. Thompson
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearline Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 610 Central, LLC
Represented By: Rufus E. Thompson
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JCP Investments, LLC
Represented By: Rufus E. Thompson
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolling' Downtown, LLC
Represented By: Rufus E. Thompson
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearlene Garcia
Represented By: Rufus E. Thompson
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company
Represented By: Donald A. DeCandia
Represented By: Patrick Compton
Represented By: Mary E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?