Applied Capital, LLC. v. Crystal Foods and Gas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Applied Capital, LLC.
Defendant: Sanjiv Patel, SBS Hotels Group, LLC, Deconstruction Development Partners, LLC, Crystal Foods and Gas, Inc. and Timothy Hightower
Case Number: 1:2020cv01343
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Applied Capital, LLC. (vh)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 6/3/2021 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 5/27/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 5/14/2021. (cd)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT re #8 MOTION for Entry of Default By the Clerk Soldiers' and Sailors' Act by Applied Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Dunn, A.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #8 MOTION for Entry of Default By the Clerk Soldiers' and Sailors' Act by Applied Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Dunn, A.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default By the Clerk by Applied Capital, LLC.. (Dunn, A.)
February 15, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Applied Capital, LLC.. Crystal Foods and Gas, Inc. served on 1/18/2021, answer due 2/8/2021. (Dunn, A.)
February 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Applied Capital, LLC.. SBS Hotels Group, LLC served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Dunn, A.)
February 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Applied Capital, LLC.. Sanjiv Patel served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Dunn, A.)
February 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Applied Capital, LLC.. Timothy Hightower served on 1/18/2021, answer due 2/8/2021. (Dunn, A.)
February 15, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Applied Capital, LLC.. Deconstruction Development Partners, LLC served on 1/18/2021, answer due 2/8/2021. (Dunn, A.)
December 30, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dr)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DEBT AND MONEY DUE against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Applied Capital, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Dunn, A.)
December 23, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7467812 re #1 Complaint, filed by Applied Capital, LLC. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Dunn, A.)
December 23, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Applied Capital, LLC. v. Crystal Foods and Gas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanjiv Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBS Hotels Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deconstruction Development Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Foods and Gas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Applied Capital, LLC.
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?