Grimando v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Grimando
Defendant: US Department of Health and Human Services, Presbyterian Medical Services doing business as Rio Rancho Family Health Center, United States of America and Claudia Alfaro-Andrick
Case Number: 1:2021cv00108
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Grimando. US Department of Health and Human Services served on 3/12/2021, answer due 5/11/2021., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Grimando. US Department of Health and Human Services served on 3/12/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Berlin, Robert)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Grimando. United States of America served on 3/12/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Berlin, Robert) Modified on 3/18/2021 (ln).
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Grimando. U.S. Attorney's Office/Civil Process Clerk of New Mexico served on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Berlin, Robert) Modified on 3/09/2021 (arp).
February 23, 2021 Summons Issued as to US Department of Health and Human Services, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. terminating Claudia Alfaro-Andrick (M.D.) and Presbyterian Medical Services., filed by Joseph Grimando. (Berlin, Robert)
February 16, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Joseph Grimando voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Berlin, Robert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 11, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7539471 re #1 Complaint filed by Joseph Grimando (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Berlin, Robert)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
February 10, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by joseph Grimando. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berlin, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimando v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presbyterian Medical Services doing business as Rio Rancho Family Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Alfaro-Andrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Grimando
Represented By: David M. Berlin
Represented By: Robert A. Berlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?