Garcia-Marquez v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Peggy Garcia-Marquez
Defendant: Renaissance Industrial Partners, LLC, Bryan Thomas and Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00116
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Filing 14 Defendant Federal Express Corporation's ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Federal Express Corporation.(Goodhue, Ryan)
March 19, 2021 Summons Issued as to Renaissance Industrial Partners, LLC. (arp)
March 16, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against Renaissance Industrial Partners, LLC, Federal Express Corporation., filed by Peggy Garcia-Marquez. (Campbell, Una)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting #8 Motion to Amend Complaint and Caption. (atc)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar granting #10 ORDER on Motion to Extend Deadlines. All current scheduling deadlines and hearings are VACATED. Plaintiff shall serve the newly added defendant in accordance with Rule 4(m). The Court will enter a new Initial Scheduling Order when Renaissance Industrial Partners, LLC, enters its appearance. (smd)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Initial Scheduling Order Deadlines by Federal Express Corporation. (Jones, Mary)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Express Corporation identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for Federal Express Corporation. (Jones, Mary)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and Caption by Peggy Garcia-Marquez. (Campbell, Una)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 Defendant Federal Express Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Federal Express Corporation. (Jones, Mary)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Peggy Garcia-Marquez (Campbell, Una)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Federal Express Corporation voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Jones, Mary)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2021 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Five minutes prior to the start of the Conference, the parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/9/2021. (smd)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Peggy Garcia-Marquez voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Campbell, Una)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
February 16, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (arp)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Express Corporation from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2020-06601. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Federal Express Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Mary)
February 12, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7542558 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Federal Express Corporation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Jones, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia-Marquez v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaissance Industrial Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Ryan T Goodhue
Represented By: Mary E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Garcia-Marquez
Represented By: Una Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?