Darnell et al v. Zia Trust, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emily J Darnell, Mary B Darnell and Cliff W Darnell
Defendant: Darryl W Millet and Zia Trust, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00125
Filed: February 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn E Mostoller on behalf of Darryl W Millet, Zia Trust, Inc. (Mostoller, Lynn)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER finding good cause and QUASHING #4 Order to Show Cause by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cd)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #4 Order to Show Cause filed by Cliff W Darnell, Mary B Darnell. (Lakins, Charles)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Emily J Darnell re #1 Complaint of Dismissal of Claims (Lakins, Charles)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Show Cause Response due by 3/8/2021. (cd)
February 16, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dr)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
February 16, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr)
February 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Cliff W Darnell re #1 Complaint of filing of Civil Cover Sheet (Lakins, Charles)
February 14, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7543248 re #1 Complaint filed by Cliff W Darnell, Emily J Darnell, Mary B Darnell (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lakins, Charles)
February 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Probate Fraud and Breach of Fiduciary Duty against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Cliff W Darnell, Emily J Darnell, Mary B Darnell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lakins, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darnell et al v. Zia Trust, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl W Millet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zia Trust, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily J Darnell
Represented By: Charles N Lakins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary B Darnell
Represented By: Charles N Lakins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliff W Darnell
Represented By: Charles N Lakins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?