Garcia v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: John Luis Garcia
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00176
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza by District Judge Martha Vazquez. (gr)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 4. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
March 2, 2021 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ke)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza as the trial and pretrial judges. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Luis Garcia. (Johnson, Laura)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by John Luis Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Laura)
February 26, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Luis Garcia
Represented By: Laura J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?