Pueblo of Laguna et al. v. Regan et al
Plaintiff: Pueblo of Jemez and Pueblo of Laguna
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers, Taylor N. Ferrell, Michael Regan and United States Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 1:2021cv00277
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER STRIKING "CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY" by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The Court strikes attorney Pacyniak's "Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney" (Doc. 15) as improperly filed. (kmt)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution: Gabriel Pacyniak substituted for Clifford Joseph Villa Jr. (Pacyniak, Gabriel)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip R. Dupre on behalf of Taylor N. Ferrell, Michael Regan, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Environmental Protection Agency (Dupre, Phillip)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW AS MOOT by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The Motions to Withdraw as Counsel (Docs. 4-8) and Amended Motions to Withdraw as Counsel (Docs. 9-12) filed by University of New Mexico School of Law Southwest Indian Law Clinic students Jessica Martinez and Max Spivak are denied as moot. (kmt)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Max Spivak by Pueblo of Jemez. (Winder, Samuel)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Max Spivak by Pueblo of Laguna. (Winder, Samuel)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jessica Martinez by Pueblo of Jemez. (Winder, Samuel)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jessica Martinez by Pueblo of Laguna. (Winder, Samuel)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Max Spivak by Pueblo of Jemez. (Winder, Samuel)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Max Spivak by Pueblo of Laguna. (Winder, Samuel)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jessica Martinez by Pueblo of Laguna. (Winder, Samuel)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jessica Martinez by Pueblo of Jemez. (Winder, Samuel)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Complaint as Counsel by Pueblo of Laguna. (Winder, Samuel)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Taylor N. Ferrell, Michael Regan, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Environmental Protection Agency. (jg)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number ALB049447 (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Pueblo of Laguna and Pueblo of Jemez against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Laguna Pueblo, Jemez, Pueblo of. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Villa, Clifford)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pueblo of Laguna et al. v. Regan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pueblo of Jemez
Represented By: Clifford Joseph Villa, Jr
Represented By: David R. Yepa
Represented By: Samuel L Winder
Represented By: Gabriel Pacyniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pueblo of Laguna
Represented By: James M Burson
Represented By: Kenneth Bobroff
Represented By: Clifford Joseph Villa, Jr
Represented By: Colleen Channing Adams
Represented By: Samuel L Winder
Represented By: Gabriel Pacyniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Phillip R. Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor N. Ferrell
Represented By: Phillip R. Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Regan
Represented By: Phillip R. Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Phillip R. Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?