Benavidez v. Andrus-Maxwell
Plaintiff: LeeRoss Benavidez
Defendant: Doris Andrus-Maxwell and Doris Maxwell
Case Number: 1:2021cv00320
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Plaintiff filed under seal 7 Response to Order to Show Cause and 9 Notice of Appearance. Parties seeking to file a document under seal are required to seek leave of Court before doing so. See CM/ECF Adm. Proc. Manual para. 9(h)(1) & (2) (leave of Court required to file documents under seal except under Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2(F), Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, or statute). Within 7 days of this Order, Plaintiff shall request leave of Court to seal these filings, or the Court will unseal them without further notice. (kfo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 7/2/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 6/22/2021. (kfo)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER QUASHING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. In light of 7 Plaintiff's response, the Court QUASHES its order to show cause. Plaintiff's counsel shall file a notice of appearance in this case within 7 days of this Order. (kfo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing no later than 05/21/2021 as to the failure to comply with #4 Order. (cm)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Doris Andrus-Maxwell. (Marquez, Chris)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED IN THIS COURT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number ALB049576 (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2021-01540. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Federal Cover Sheet)(Marquez, Chris)
April 9, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benavidez v. Andrus-Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Andrus-Maxwell
Represented By: Chris R. Marquez
Represented By: William Spencer Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Maxwell
Represented By: Chris R. Marquez
Represented By: William Spencer Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeeRoss Benavidez
Represented By: Rachel O. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?