Esquibel-Mead v. American General Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Katheranne Esquibel-Mead
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00365
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Paul Kelly
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar Vacating Second Initial Scheduling Order. All instructions, deadlines and hearings in the Second Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 23) are VACATED. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
June 11, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Settlement and Motion to Stay Deadlines by American General Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines) (Boyea, Amy)
June 4, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE by American General Life Insurance Company re #16 First MOTION to Withdraw to Withdraw State Jury Request, #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) of Agreed Extension of American General's Deadline to File Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss and Response to Motion to Withdraw State Jury Request (Boyea, Amy)
June 2, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 First MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Boyea, Amy)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SECOND INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2021. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. (kc)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON MAY 27, 2021 STATUS CONFERENCE by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. denying Plaintiff's request to limit the involvement of Defendant's lead counsel. (rt)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. denying #8 Motion to Remand; withdrawing #9 Motion to Compel; withdrawing #14 Motion to Compel. (rt)
June 1, 2021 Filing 20 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr.: Status Conference held on 5/27/2021. (Court Reporter Paul Baca) (rt)
May 30, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Discovery , First MOTION to Dismiss Count II UPA Claims by Katheranne Esquibel-Mead. (Jeffries, Eric)
May 26, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 First MOTION to Compel Defendant's Mandatory Corporate Registration Under NMSA Sec. 53-17-20, #14 Second MOTION to Compel to Compel Defendant's Mandatory Corporate Registration Under Section NMSA Section 53-17-20 filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Virginia N. Puzon, #2 Exhibit 1) (Boyea, Amy)
May 26, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 First MOTION to Remand filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Virginia N. Puzon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Boyea, Amy)
May 25, 2021 Filing 16 First MOTION to Withdraw to Withdraw State Jury Request by Katheranne Esquibel-Mead. (Jeffries, Eric)
May 24, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Plaintiffs Original Complaint filed by Katheranne Esquibel-Mead. (Jeffries, Eric)
May 21, 2021 Filing 14 Second MOTION to Compel to Compel Defendant's Mandatory Corporate Registration Under Section NMSA Section 53-17-20 by Katheranne Esquibel-Mead. (Jeffries, Eric)
May 19, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Katheranne Esquibel-Mead. (Jeffries, Eric)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. granting #11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); Plaintiff shall file a response by noon, 5/24/2021. (rt)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Katheranne Esquibel-Mead. (Jeffries, Eric)
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - 420 Mimbres Courtroom before Circuit Judge Paul Kelly Jr. (rt)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION to Compel Defendant's Mandatory Corporate Registration Under NMSA Sec. 53-17-20 by Katheranne Esquibel-Mead. (Jeffries, Eric)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION to Remand by Katheranne Esquibel-Mead. (Jeffries, Eric)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by American General Life Insurance Company re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Notice of Completion and Consent to Grant Motion (Boyea, Amy)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. All instructions, deadlines and hearings in the Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 3) are VACATED. (kc)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 COUNTERCLAIM for Unjust Enrichment against Katheranne Esquibel-Mead, filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Boyea, Amy)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeff Reinbold, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Boyea, Amy)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 5/24/2021. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. (kc)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American General Life Insurance Company (Apodaca, Leslie)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American General Life Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, Bernalillo, case number D-202-CV-2021-01618. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Apodaca, Leslie)
April 21, 2021 United States Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
April 21, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7652533 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by American General Life Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Apodaca, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esquibel-Mead v. American General Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Leslie McCarthy Apodaca
Represented By: Amy Boyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katheranne Esquibel-Mead
Represented By: Eric Sedillo Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?