Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Jurish et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: Kirtland Federal Credit Union, Max A. Jurish and Georgianna Jurish
Case Number: 1:2021cv00375
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Amended Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Kirtland Federal Credit Union. (Hammar, Kevin)
June 4, 2021 Summons On Amended Complaint Issued as to Georgianna Jurish, Max A. Jurish, Kirtland Federal Credit Union. (jg)
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Foreclosure against All Defendants., filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Walters, Ryan)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Walters, Ryan)
April 28, 2021 Summons Issued as to Georgianna Jurish, Max A. Jurish, Kirtland Federal Credit Union. (jg)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #3 Motion to Remand by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Walters, Ryan)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee Received online: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC 7657947 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 WITHDRAWN MOTION to Remand by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Walters, Ryan) Modified text on 4/27/2021 (vh).
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Foreclosure against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Owner Trustee of the Residential Credit Opportunities Trust V-B. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Walters, Ryan)
April 23, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Jurish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirtland Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Jason Michael Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max A. Jurish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgianna Jurish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Ryan M Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?