Strong v. Scout Security, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: John Strong
Defendant: Scout Security Limited, Daniel Roberts, Scout Security, Inc., Sol Majteles, Dave Shapiro and Anthony Brown
Case Number: 1:2021cv00418
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Kea W Riggs
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time due to the pending dispositive motion: #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Scout Security Limited, Sol Majteles, Scout Security, Inc., Daniel Roberts, Dave Shapiro, Anthony Brown. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Anthony Brown, Sol Majteles, Daniel Roberts, Scout Security Limited, Scout Security, Inc., Dave Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Vigil, Charles)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 14. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J. Vigil on behalf of Scout Security, Inc. (Vigil, Charles)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (ccp)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge unless consents from all parties have been filed by Friday, June 18, 2021. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (tl) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Anthony Brown, Sol Majteles, Daniel Roberts, Scout Security Limited, Scout Security, Inc., Dave Shapiro. (Apodaca, Leslie)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Anthony Brown, Sol Majteles, Daniel Roberts, Scout Security Limited, Scout Security, Inc., Dave Shapiro (Apodaca, Leslie)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Court-Annexed Arbitration Certification, Jury Demand, Peremptory Election to Excuse and Notice of Judge Reassignment served on Sol Majteles on 05/04/2021, filed by John Strong. (Kafka, Jacqueline)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Court-Annexed Arbitration Certification, Jury Demand, Peremptory Election to Excuse and Notice of Judge Reassignment served on Anthony Brown on 04/30/2021, filed by John Strong. (Kafka, Jacqueline)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Daniel Roberts, Scout Security Limited, Dave Shapiro. (jg)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Court-Annexed Arbitration Certification, Jury Demand, Peremptory Election to Excuse and Notice of Judge Reassignment served on Scout Security, Inc. on April 20, 2021, filed by John Strong. (Kafka, Jacqueline)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Scout Security, Inc. of Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint (Apodaca, Leslie)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scout Security, Inc. (Apodaca, Leslie)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Scout Security, Inc. by Leslie McCarthy Apodaca on behalf of: Edward L. Shapiro Much Shelist, P.C. 191 North Wacker Drive, Ste. 1800Chicago, IL 60606-1615 (312) 521-2000 eshapiro@muchlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Apodaca, Leslie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie McCarthy Apodaca on behalf of Scout Security, Inc. (Apodaca, Leslie)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Scout Security, Inc. from Bernalillo, 2nd Judicial, case number D-202-CV-2021-01522. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Scout Security, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Apodaca, Leslie)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7674020 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Scout Security, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Apodaca, Leslie)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7674082 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Scout Security, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Apodaca, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strong v. Scout Security, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scout Security Limited
Represented By: Leslie McCarthy Apodaca
Represented By: Edward L. Shapiro
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Roberts
Represented By: Leslie McCarthy Apodaca
Represented By: Edward L. Shapiro
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scout Security, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie McCarthy Apodaca
Represented By: Edward L. Shapiro
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sol Majteles
Represented By: Leslie McCarthy Apodaca
Represented By: Edward L. Shapiro
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Shapiro
Represented By: Leslie McCarthy Apodaca
Represented By: Edward L. Shapiro
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Brown
Represented By: Leslie McCarthy Apodaca
Represented By: Edward L. Shapiro
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Strong
Represented By: Jacqueline K Kafka
Represented By: Arlyn G Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?