Arteaga v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Marilin Arteaga
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00530
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General served on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (gr)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorneys Office served on 7/13/2021, answer due 9/11/2021. (gr)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration served on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (gr)
June 29, 2021 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar as the trial and pretrial judges. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING SERVICE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (gbg)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 10, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arteaga v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilin Arteaga
Represented By: Amber L Dengler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?