Raphoz v. Fenn et al
Plaintiff: Bruno Raphoz
Defendant: Forrest Fenn, Dan Barbarisi, Jonathan Stuef and Shiloh Old
Case Number: 1:2021cv00553
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REOPEN #14 Second Amended Complaint by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case, Doc. #12 , filed July 28, 2021, remains DENIED. (cmm)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Bruno Raphoz against Jonathan Stuef, Shiloh Old, Forrest Fenn, Dan Barbarisi. (cmm)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson DENYING #12 MOTION to Reopen Case. (cmm)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Reopen Case by Bruno Raphoz. (cmm)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7795365 re #1 Complaint filed by Bruno Raphoz (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Raphoz, Bruno)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 58 JUDGMENT by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. (meq)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. (meq)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson assigned. (jg)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CMECF PRO SE NOTIFICATION FORM electing to receive notification via e-mail by Bruno Raphoz (arp)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Bruno Raphoz. (arp)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter by Bruno Raphoz (mjr)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER for Amended Complaint and Granting Motion to File Electronically by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. IT IS ORDERED that: (i) Plaintiff shall, within 21 days of entry of this Order, file an amended complaint. Failure to timely file an amended complaint may result in dismissal of this case; (ii) Plaintiff shall, within 21 days of entry of this Order, pay the fee for instituting a civil action. Failure to timely pay the fee may result in dismissal of this case; (iii) The Clerk of Court shall terminate Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, Doc. 3, filed June 15, 2021; and (iv) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Electronically, Doc. 4, filed June 15, 2021, is GRANTED. (kc)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (jg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Electronically File by Bruno Raphoz. (jg)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bruno Raphoz. (jg)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CMECF PRO SE NOTIFICATION FORM electing to receive notification via e-mail by Bruno Raphoz (jg)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dan Barbarisi, Forrest Fenn, Shiloh Old, Jonathan Stuef, filed by Bruno Raphoz. (jg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jg). (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/16/2021) (jg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raphoz v. Fenn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest Fenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Barbarisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Stuef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiloh Old
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruno Raphoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?