Gospel Ministries International, Inc. v. Premier Property Sales, LTD et al
Plaintiff: Gospel Ministries International, Inc.
Defendant: Dylan Stormont, Clay Chester, Dewayne's Aircraft Services, LLC, Premier Property Sales, LTD, Brandtley Greenlaw and David Gates
Case Number: 1:2021cv00566
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Gospel Ministries International, Inc..(Shanor, Stephen)
August 12, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gospel Ministries International, Inc.. Clay Chester served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. (Shanor, Stephen)
August 12, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gospel Ministries International, Inc.. Premier Property Sales, LTD served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. (Shanor, Stephen)
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gospel Ministries International, Inc.. Dylan Stormont served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. (Shanor, Stephen)
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gospel Ministries International, Inc.. Dewayne's Aircraft Services, LLC served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. (Shanor, Stephen)
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clay Chester First set of Discovery (Dolan, Daniel)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 FILED IN ERROR - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gospel Ministries International, Inc. First set of Discovery (Dolan, Daniel) Will re-file with correct case caption. Modified on 7/26/2021 (arp).
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 Premier Property Sales, Ltd and Clay Chester's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT For Damages against Brandtley Greenlaw, David Gates, First COUNTERCLAIM For Damages against Gospel Ministries International, Inc. by Clay Chester, Premier Property Sales, LTD. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Gospel Ministries International, Inc..(Dolan, Daniel)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # ANMDC-7793837 re: 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Plaintiff Gospel Ministries International, Inc. (cmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Gospel Ministries International, Inc. (Shanor, Stephen)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Gospel Ministries International, Inc. by Stephen Shanor on behalf of: Greg Flax Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper, PLL 500 N. Fountain AvenueSpringfield, OH 45504 937-324-5541 gflax@martinbrowne.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Shanor, Stephen)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (arp)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 21, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Negligence, Negligence Per Se, Intentional Tort, and Breach of Contract against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Gospel Ministries International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shanor, Stephen)
June 18, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7748246 re #1 Complaint, filed by Gospel Ministries International, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Shanor, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gospel Ministries International, Inc. v. Premier Property Sales, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Stormont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay Chester
Represented By: Daniel R. Dolan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne's Aircraft Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Property Sales, LTD
Represented By: Daniel R. Dolan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandtley Greenlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gospel Ministries International, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Greg Flax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?