Clark et al v. Bradford et al
Plaintiff: Ingrid C Clark and Terry Wayne Anderson
Defendant: CRST Expedited, Inc. and Fredrick E Bradford
Case Number: 1:2021cv00577
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Judith C Herrera
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fredrick E Bradford, CRST Expedited, Inc. CRST Expedited's First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production to Plaintiff Terry Anderson and Plaintiff Ingrid Clark (Richards, Lance)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Settlement Conference set for 2/9/2022 at 09:00 AM remote via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN and SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Discovery due by 6/1/2022. Motions due by 7/1/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/29/2022. (cda)
August 11, 2021 Filing 17 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing: Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 8/11/2021. (cda)
August 11, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fredrick E Bradford, CRST Expedited, Inc. service of Initial Disclosures to Plaintiffs (Richards, Lance)
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 Joint Status Report Joint Status Report Clark/Anderson v. Bradford/CRST by Terry Wayne Anderson (Caruso, Mark)
July 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 10. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
July 22, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Fredrick E Bradford. (Richards, Lance)
July 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Dean Richards on behalf of Fredrick E Bradford (Richards, Lance)
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2021 at 02:15 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 8/4/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/20/2021. (ccp)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover sheet by Fredrick E Bradford, CRST Expedited, Inc. (Richards, Lance)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fredrick E Bradford, CRST Expedited, Inc. (Richards, Lance)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fredrick E Bradford, CRST Expedited, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CRST Expedited, Inc. for CRST Expedited, Inc., Fredrick E Bradford. (Richards, Lance)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Fredrick E Bradford, CRST Expedited, Inc. Acceptance of Service on behalf of Defendants (Richards, Lance)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Dean Richards on behalf of Fredrick E Bradford, CRST Expedited, Inc. (Richards, Lance)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Fredrick E Bradford, CRST Expedited, Inc.. (Richards, Lance)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRST Expedited, Inc., Fredrick E Bradford from first Judicial District Court, Santa Fe County, case number D101cv202100969. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by CRST Expedited, Inc., Fredrick E Bradford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Richards, Lance)
June 24, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7756833 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Fredrick E Bradford, CRST Expedited, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Richards, Lance)
June 24, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Bradford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST Expedited, Inc.
Represented By: Lance Dean Richards
Represented By: Lauren Wilber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredrick E Bradford
Represented By: Lance Dean Richards
Represented By: Lauren Wilber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid C Clark
Represented By: Meaghan T. Baca
Represented By: Mark J Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Wayne Anderson
Represented By: Meaghan T. Baca
Represented By: Mark J Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?