Brothers Holding Company, LLC v. Alliance International Aviation et al
Plaintiff: Brothers Holding Company, LLC
Defendant: Danny Perry, Liliana Perry, Alliance International Aviation, LLC, Michael Perry, Vernon Aviation, LLC and Leann Perry
Counter Defendant: George W. Riley, Natalie Riley, Anna Riley, L&B Properties, LLC and Gary M. Riley
Counter Claimant: Alliance International Aviation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00588
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Alliance International Aviation, LLC, Danny Perry, Leann Perry, Liliana Perry, Michael Perry of Certificate of Good Standing of Peter J. Moolenaar (Creely, Gene)
August 4, 2021 Filing 13 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Counter Claimant Alliance International Aviation, LLC, Defendants Alliance International Aviation, LLC, Danny Perry, Leann Perry, Liliana Perry, Michael Perry, Vernon Aviation, LLC by Gene Francis Creely, II on behalf of: Peter J. Moolenaar Gallagher & Kennedy 2575 E Camelback RoadPhoenix, AZ 85016 602-530-8145 Fax 602-530-8500 peter.moolenaar@gknet.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Creely, Gene)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 4, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7820631 re: # 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Michael Perry, Vernon Aviation, LLC, Danny Perry, Alliance International Aviation, LLC, Leann Perry, Liliana Perry (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Creely, Gene)
July 23, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by L&B Properties, LLC (Schlagel, Rodney)
July 23, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brothers Holding Company, LLC (Schlagel, Rodney)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 9/28/2021. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 10/12/2021. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 10/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call the Court's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/14/2021. (tl)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER AND VACATING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The Court's Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 4), including all hearings and deadlines set forth therein, is hereby VACATED. The Court will issue a separate Order resetting the scheduling conference and related deadlines. (tl)
July 20, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines by Brothers Holding Company, LLC, L&B Properties, LLC, Anna Riley, Gary M. Riley, George W. Riley, Natalie Riley. (Schlagel, Rodney)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gary M. Riley, Natalie Riley, L&B Properties, LLC, Anna Riley, Brothers Holding Company, LLC, George W. Riley as to Gary M. Riley, Natalie Riley, L&B Properties, LLC, Anna Riley, Brothers Holding Company, LLC, George W. Riley. (Schlagel, Rodney)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney L. Schlagel on behalf of Brothers Holding Company, LLC, L&B Properties, LLC, Anna Riley, Gary M. Riley, George W. Riley, Natalie Riley (Schlagel, Rodney)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Counter Claimant Alliance International Aviation, LLC, Defendants Alliance International Aviation, LLC, Danny Perry, Leann Perry, Liliana Perry, Michael Perry, Vernon Aviation, LLC by Peter Moolenaar (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Moolenaar, Peter)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 9, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7779331 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Michael Perry, Vernon Aviation, LLC, Danny Perry, Alliance International Aviation, LLC, Leann Perry, Liliana Perry (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Moolenaar, Peter)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 7/20/2021. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 8/2/2021. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 8/10/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call the Court's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/5/2021. (tl)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, filed by Alliance International Aviation. (Creely, Gene)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Eleventh Judicial, case number D-1116-CV-2021-00623. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement)(Creely, Gene)
June 25, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7758747 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Michael Perry, Danny Perry, Alliance International Aviation, Vernon Aviation, Leann Perry, Liliana Perry (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Creely, Gene)
June 25, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brothers Holding Company, LLC v. Alliance International Aviation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Perry
Represented By: Gene Francis Creely, II
Represented By: Peter Moolenaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liliana Perry
Represented By: Gene Francis Creely, II
Represented By: Peter Moolenaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance International Aviation, LLC
Represented By: Gene Francis Creely, II
Represented By: Peter Moolenaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Perry
Represented By: Gene Francis Creely, II
Represented By: Peter Moolenaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Aviation, LLC
Represented By: Gene Francis Creely, II
Represented By: Peter Moolenaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leann Perry
Represented By: Gene Francis Creely, II
Represented By: Peter Moolenaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: George W. Riley
Represented By: Nicholas W Chiado
Represented By: Rodney L. Schlagel
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Sanders
Represented By: Sarah L. Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Natalie Riley
Represented By: Nicholas W Chiado
Represented By: Rodney L. Schlagel
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Sanders
Represented By: Sarah L. Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Anna Riley
Represented By: Nicholas W Chiado
Represented By: Rodney L. Schlagel
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Sanders
Represented By: Sarah L. Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: L&B Properties, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas W Chiado
Represented By: Rodney L. Schlagel
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Sanders
Represented By: Sarah L. Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Gary M. Riley
Represented By: Nicholas W Chiado
Represented By: Rodney L. Schlagel
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Sanders
Represented By: Sarah L. Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Alliance International Aviation
Represented By: Gene Francis Creely, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brothers Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas W Chiado
Represented By: Rodney L. Schlagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?